Global patent index - EP 0748645 B1

EP 0748645 B1 2000-08-16 - METHOD USING A ROTATING FILTER

Title (en)

METHOD USING A ROTATING FILTER

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG EINES ROTIERENDEN FILTERS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'UTILISATION D' UN FILTRE ROTATIF

Publication

EP 0748645 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96109261 A

Priority

DE 19521963 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19521963C1] To filter out particles from a fluid, using a rotating filter, the filter surface speed is higher than the fluid so that particles striking the filter surface rebound and are spun off by centrifugal forces before they enter the filter pores and clog the filter. The fluid is delivered to the filter surface at a tangent. The filter can be a hollow and porous ceramic body.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01D 33/073; B01D 33/72

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01D 39/20 (2006.01); B01D 33/06 (2006.01); B01D 33/073 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01D 33/073 (2013.01); B01D 2201/287 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

B01D 33/073 + B01D 33/37 + B01D 33/56 + B01D 33/727

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19521963 C1 19961024; AT 195437 T 20000915; CA 2178796 A1 19961217; CA 2178796 C 20001114; EP 0748645 A2 19961218; EP 0748645 A3 19970402; EP 0748645 B1 20000816; ES 2151979 T3 20010116; JP H09826 A 19970107

INPADOC legal status

2005-06-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050610

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20020711

2002-04-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020403

2002-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020228

2002-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2002-02-05 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2002-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20010610

2001-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: NYFOTEK A/S

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20010630

2001-08-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010630

2001-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010630

2001-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010630

2001-06-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010630

2001-06-13 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2001-06-11 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010611

2001-06-10 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010610

2001-06-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010610

2001-06-10 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010610

2001-04-19 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010419

2001-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2151979

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-12-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-12-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ROTTMANN, ZIMMERMANN + PARTNER AG

2000-12-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20001116

2000-11-17 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001117

2000-11-16 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001116

2000-11-16 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001116

2000-11-14 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-09-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59605748

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-09-21

2000-09-06 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2000-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 19960708

2000-08-16 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000816

2000-08-16 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000816

2000-08-16 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000816

2000-08-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 195437

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-09-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-09-29 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: METHOD USING A ROTATING FILTER

1998-02-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19971223

1997-10-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970827

1997-07-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NYFOTEK A.S.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1997-07-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: LUNDIN, ERIC GUSTAF

1997-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1997-04-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 960708

1996-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1996-12-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 960708