Global Patent Index - EP 0748732 B1

EP 0748732 B1 2000-03-01 - Actuating and supporting device of protective elements esp. of protective caps and doors of cableway installations

Title (en)

Actuating and supporting device of protective elements esp. of protective caps and doors of cableway installations

Title (de)

Betätigungs- und Haltevorrichtung von Schutzelementen, insbesondere von Schutzhauben und Türen an Seilbahnanlagen

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'actionnement et de support d'éléments de protection, notamment des capots de protection ou des portes d'installations de téléphérage

Publication

EP 0748732 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96201602 A

Priority

IT BZ950036 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0748732A1] The operating and holding device is mainly for protective hoods and doors of cable railway systems. It includes an operating device which is controlled from the entry and exit stations, a transmission element (11) linking the operating device to the protective element (5), and a holder to keep the protective element open or closed. The holder consists of a crank lever (14). One of its arms is connected in its end zone to the end of the transmission element. There is a roller (20) able to turn on the pivot of the lever, acted on by a bold turning on the protective element at a clearance from its turning axis.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61B 12/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61B 12/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61B 12/002 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

EP 0510357 A1 19921028 - DOPPELMAYR & SOHN [AT]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0748732 A1 19961218; EP 0748732 B1 20000301; AT 190017 T 20000315; DE 59604519 D1 20000406; IT 1281285 B1 19980217; IT BZ950036 A1 19961216; IT BZ950036 D0 19950614

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-05-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140607

2015-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-04-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59604519

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-03-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150227

2015-02-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 190017 T

- Effective date: 20140607

2015-01-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59604519

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130624

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130612

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130612

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120529

- Year of fee payment: 17

2001-02-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KELLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2000-04-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604519 20000406

2000-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR LI SE

2000-03-01 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-03-01 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-03-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 190017 T 20000315

1998-12-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981109

1997-05-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970326

1996-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR LI SE