Global Patent Index - EP 0748733 B1

EP 0748733 B1 2000-04-19 - Unlocking device for a window pane, especially for railway carriages, with a sliding or swinging window pane

Title (en)

Unlocking device for a window pane, especially for railway carriages, with a sliding or swinging window pane

Title (de)

Entriegelungsvorrichtung für eine Fensterscheibe, insbesondere für Eisenbahnwaggons, mit verschiebbarer oder ausschwenkbarer Fensterscheibe

Title (fr)

Dispositif de déverrouillage pour une vitre, en particulier pour wagons de chemin de fer, avec une vitre coulissante ou pivotante

Publication

EP 0748733 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96109467 A

Priority

DE 19521877 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0748733A1] The unlocking device is for a window (1) fixed to a frame, with an unlocking element to release it from the frame. A power element (2) is provided to turn or push the window out of the frame when it is operated. It may be possible to push the window from a closed position to an open position within the frame. In the closed position, it may be loaded by a spring (4) in the open-position direction, and held in the closed position by an arresting member, namely the power element. This may be fixed to the frame, and has a retractable locking pin (5) to fit in a recess in the window.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61D 25/00; B60J 1/10; B61D 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/54 (2006.01); B60J 1/00 (2006.01); B60J 1/17 (2006.01); B61D 19/02 (2006.01); B61D 25/00 (2006.01); E06B 3/64 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61D 19/023 (2013.01); B61D 25/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0748733 A1 19961218; EP 0748733 B1 20000419; CN 1149098 A 19970507; DE 19521877 A1 19961219; JP H0913812 A 19970114

INPADOC legal status


2002-04-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020403

2001-04-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-18 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000419

2000-09-15 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-08-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20000816

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-07-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000719

2000-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604986 20000525

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2000-04-19 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000419

2000-04-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000419

2000-04-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000419

1998-10-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980910

1997-08-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970604

1996-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE