Global Patent Index - EP 0748859 B1

EP 0748859 B1 2000-05-24 - Process and apparatus to partially uncouple the generation and utilization of pyrolysis gas in a pyrolysis plant

Title (en)

Process and apparatus to partially uncouple the generation and utilization of pyrolysis gas in a pyrolysis plant

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Teilentkopplung von Schwelgaserzeugung und Schwelgasverbrauch bei einer Pyrolyseanlage

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour le découplage partiel de la génération et de l'utilisation du gaz de pyrolyse dans une installation de pyrolyse

Publication

EP 0748859 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95810396 A

Priority

EP 95810396 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0748859A1] This procedure partly decouples production from demand in a pyrolysis plant producing gas. The gas from the pyrolysis reactor is normally sent to a converter producing cracked gas, which is used as an environmentally-friendly fuel. In this new process the gas stream leaving pyrolysis is condensed ahead of the converter, during periods of low gas demand. At higher demands, fuel supply is augmented by vaporisation of the condensed gas. Also claimed is a plant to carry out the procedure with an assembly (10) operable as either a condenser or as a through-flow heater, between the pyrolysis reactor and the gas converter.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10B 53/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10B 53/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10B 53/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK FR GB IT LU NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0748859 A1 19961218; EP 0748859 B1 20000524; DE 59508397 D1 20000629

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040101

2002-06-03 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020603

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: ALUMINIUM RHEINFELDEN G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20000630

2000-11-22 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000524

2000-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-10-20 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-08-24 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000824

2000-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000630

2000-06-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508397 20000629

2000-06-14 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000614

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK FR GB IT LU NL

2000-05-24 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000524

2000-05-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000524

2000-05-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000524

2000-05-24 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000524

1999-09-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990812

1997-08-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970605

1997-02-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK FR GB IT LU NL

1996-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK FR GB IT LU NL