Global Patent Index - EP 0748889 B1

EP 0748889 B1 2001-12-19 - Method for manufacturing a spacer knitwear and a spacer knitwear thus obtained

Title (en)

Method for manufacturing a spacer knitwear and a spacer knitwear thus obtained

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Abstandswirkware sowie danach hergestellte Abstandswirkware

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la fabrication d'un tricot entretoise et tricot entretoise ainsi obtenu

Publication

EP 0748889 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96109291 A

Priority

DE 19521443 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0748889A2] To produce a spacer knit-goods, with variable local levels between facing ground fabrics, the material is produced on a warp knitter and especially a double rib knit Raschel, using two equidistant non-contoured needle bars. The neighbouring fabric sections (A-C) are assembled with the pile yarn segment (PA,PB,PC) lengths either equal to or greater than the gap between the needle bars. In adjacent fabric sections (A-C) with pile segments (PA,PB,PC) of different lengths, the ground fabric sections (G1A,G1B,G1C;G2A,G2B,G2C) hang directly together on one side of the needle bar as a closed material, and they do not hang directly together on the other side of the needle bar as an open fabric. Also claimed is a spacer knitted material with at least one pile catch yarn worked at the transits between ground fabric sections (G1A,G1B,G1C;G2A,G2B,G2C) with different pile segment lengths, at the edge of the open ground fabric side. It is bonded into the ground fabric (G1,G2) of the sections (A-C) with the shorter pile yarn segments (PA,PB,PC) at a gap in each of at least one row of stitches. At least one pile yarn segment (PA,PB,PC) is between the bonding points, from at least one row of stitches of the sections (A-C) with the longer pile yarn segments (PA,PB,PC), looped round.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04B 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04B 21/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 21/20 (2013.01); D10B 2403/0221 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0748889 A2 19961218; EP 0748889 A3 19980722; EP 0748889 B1 20011219; DE 19521443 A1 19961219; DE 19521443 C2 20010419

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140611

2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140611

2015-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-03-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150227

2015-03-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59608477

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140611

2015-01-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59608477

2014-08-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: HOLBEINSTRASSE 36-38, 4051 BASEL (CH)

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130823

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130529

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130604

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130627

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130626

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: CETEX CHEMNITZER TEXTILMASCHINENENTWICKLUNG GGMBH

- Free text: CETEX CHEMNITZER TEXTILMASCHINENENTWICKLUNG GGMBH#ALTCHEMNITZER STRASSE 11#09120 CHEMNITZ (DE) -TRANSFER TO- CETEX CHEMNITZER TEXTILMASCHINENENTWICKLUNG GGMBH#ALTCHEMNITZER STRASSE 11#09120 CHEMNITZ (DE)

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2002-06-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-03-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020301

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59608477 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-01-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991213

1999-03-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990120

1998-07-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1996-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI