Global Patent Index - EP 0748895 B1

EP 0748895 B1 2001-05-02 - Calender

Title (en)

Calender

Title (de)

Kalander

Title (fr)

Calendre

Publication

EP 0748895 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96108397 A

Priority

DE 19521402 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19521402C1] A calender set for the treatment of paper web has at least one roller stack which has, for top and bottom rollers, flexion compensation rollers each with a casing supported by hydrostatic elements mounted on an internal stationary carriage and, for intermediate rollers, both hard and elastic rollers. The rollers form at least four working gaps, which are bounded by one hard and one elastic roller, and if necessary a changeover gap bounded by two elastic rollers. The top (2) and bottom (3) roller casings (15, 15a) carry a cover (27a) of flexible elastic plastic or are themselves of elastic plastic with a deformation factor defined by: F = {(1.4 x 10<5>)/E} x (100/S)<2.65> \- 4 where E is the modulus of elasticity for the roller cover in N/mm<2> and S is the wall thickness in mm. The neighbouring intermediate rollers (4, 13) are hard rollers.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21G 1/00; D21G 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B30B 9/00 (2006.01); D21G 1/00 (2006.01); D21G 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21G 1/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE FI FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19521402 C1 19960704; DE 19521402 C2 20020207; AT 200920 T 20010515; CA 2176778 A1 19961214; CA 2176778 C 19990914; DE 59606842 D1 20010607; EA 000188 B1 19981224; EA 199600030 A2 19961231; EA 199600030 A3 19970331; EP 0748895 A2 19961218; EP 0748895 A3 19980513; EP 0748895 B1 20010502; JP 2665215 B2 19971022; JP H093791 A 19970107; KR 0170075 B1 19990330; US 5755156 A 19980526

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081202

2009-02-27 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080528

2007-05-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070522

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-05-14 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20070514

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-01-16 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-05-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060529

2005-05-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050528

2005-05-12 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050512

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-03-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-02-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041201

2005-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-19 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2004-12-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *VOITH PAPER PATENT G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-05-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040528

2004-05-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040528

2003-05-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030528

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-05-26 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030526

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-05-23 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030523

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-05-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030522

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-04-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030422

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-04-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606842 20010607

2001-06-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-05-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010508

2001-05-07 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FI FR GB IT NL SE

2001-05-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 200920 T 20010515

2001-01-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2001-01-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER GMBH

2000-05-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000323

1998-06-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980422

1998-05-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FI FR GB IT NL SE

1996-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FI FR GB IT NL SE