Global Patent Index - EP 0748896 B1

EP 0748896 B1 2002-09-11 - Security document and process for production thereof

Title (en)

Security document and process for production thereof

Title (de)

Sicherheitsdokument und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung

Title (fr)

Document de sécurité et son procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 0748896 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96109215 A

Priority

DE 19521048 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0748896A1] A security document, esp. a bank note, identity card or the like, is provided with a magnetic material (pref. iron, nickel or a magnetic alloy) of 10-250 Oe coercivity and pref. greater than 100nWb/m. remanence for automatic authentification of the document. Also claimed is a method of producing the above security document by applying or introducing magnetisable material onto or into a substrate to form a magnetisable layer of 20-250 Oe coercivity and then cutting the substrate into security elements.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 21/48; B42D 15/10; D21H 21/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42D 15/00 (2006.01); B42D 25/355 (2014.01); D21H 21/48 (2006.01); G07D 7/04 (2016.01); G07F 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42D 25/369 (2014.10); B42D 25/355 (2014.10); B42D 25/373 (2014.10); D21H 21/48 (2013.01); G07D 7/04 (2013.01); G07F 7/086 (2013.01); B42D 2033/10 (2013.01); B42D 2033/16 (2013.01); Y10S 428/90 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12465 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19521048 A1 19961212; EP 0748896 A1 19961218; EP 0748896 B1 20020911; ES 2180675 T3 20030216; HU 224506 B1 20051028; HU 9601578 A2 19970128; HU 9601578 A3 19990428; HU 9601578 D0 19960729; PL 185817 B1 20030829; PL 314678 A1 19961223; US 6146773 A 20001114

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160606

2016-06-29 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20160606

2016-06-07 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59609639

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150625

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150630

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150623

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-05-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59609639

2006-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050608

2006-08-31 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060101

2006-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-21 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060101

2005-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-14 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050614

2005-06-08 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050608

2005-06-08 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050608

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2004-06-23 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040623

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-06-23 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20040623

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-06-22 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040622

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-06-22 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20040622

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-06-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040618

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-06-17 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040617

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2180675 T3

2002-12-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021202

2002-12-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59609639 20021017

2002-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19960607

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

1999-07-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990602

1997-08-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970610

1996-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

1996-12-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 960607