Global Patent Index - EP 0748911 B1

EP 0748911 B1 2001-12-05 - Espagnolette for the wing of a door or a window

Title (en)

Espagnolette for the wing of a door or a window

Title (de)

Treibstangen-Verschlussvorrichtung für die Flügel von Fenstern, Türen od. dgl.

Title (fr)

Crémone pour le battant d'une fenêtre ou d'une porte

Publication

EP 0748911 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96105162 A

Priority

DE 29509175 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0748911A1] The closure device is attached to the hinged side of the door or window. It has a closure element (2) attached to the door or window frame (26). There are sliding bolts (3), secured to the door or window (25), selectively brought into engagement with the closure element via an operating drive. The sliding bolts are provided by eccentric bolts supported by a drive rod (5) with a claw opening at one end.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 9/18; E05C 9/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/18 (2006.01); E05B 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/066 (2013.01); E05C 9/1808 (2013.01); E05B 63/0056 (2013.01); E05C 9/185 (2013.01); E05C 9/1858 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 29509175 U1 19961017; AT 210236 T 20011215; EP 0748911 A1 19961218; EP 0748911 B1 20011205

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100330

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101001

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-12-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101130

2010-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100330

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090325

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090331

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090318

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-04-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090324

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2004-03-26 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040326

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-11-19 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030330

2003-03-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030330

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-02-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020227

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59608340 20020117

2002-01-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011206

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PA ALDO ROEMPLER

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210236 T 20011215

2001-09-07 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

1999-06-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990429

1997-03-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970109

1996-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI