Global patent index - EP 0748930 B1

EP 0748930 B1 2000-08-09 - Method for detecting operating failures in a fuel injection apparatus for an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Method for detecting operating failures in a fuel injection apparatus for an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Erkennen von Betriebsstörungen in einer Kraftstoffeinspritzanlage einer Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Méthode de détection de fautes de fonctionnement d'un dispositif d'injection de carburant pour moteur à combustion

Publication

EP 0748930 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96106869 A

Priority

DE 19521791 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0748930A2] The method involves detecting the pressure at least two defined times (t1,t2) between the end of an injection and the start of a fuel delivery or between the end of the delivery and the start of an injection. If the difference between the pressure values exceeds a threshold a fault is detected. The delivery and injection for at least one cylinder can be cut of for at least one cycle during normal operation and the pressure measured at least two defined times. If the difference between these pressure values exceeds a threshold a fault is indicated.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/22; F02D 41/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/22 (2006.01); F02D 41/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/221 (2013.01); F02D 41/3809 (2013.01); F02D 2041/224 (2013.01); F02D 2041/225 (2013.01); F02D 2200/0602 (2013.01); F02D 2250/31 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

JP H06213051 A 19940802 - NIPPON DENSO CO

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0748930 A2 19961218; EP 0748930 A3 19980114; EP 0748930 B1 20000809; DE 19521791 A1 19961219; US 5708202 A 19980113

INPADOC legal status

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100502

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100502

2011-02-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-01-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100502

2010-01-15 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

2010-01-15 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090522

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090525

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090513

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090527

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-09-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-09-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59605704

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-09-14

2000-09-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000822

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-05-12 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

1999-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990222

1999-04-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1998-03-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971220

1998-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1997-10-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLER-BENZ AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1996-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT