Global Patent Index - EP 0749135 B1

EP 0749135 B1 2001-05-16 - Control button with latch, particularly for controlling an electrical component

Title (en)

Control button with latch, particularly for controlling an electrical component

Title (de)

Bedienungstaste mit Verriegelung, insbesondere zur Bedienung einer elektrische Komponente

Title (fr)

Bouton de commande à accrochage, notamment pour action sur un composant électrique

Publication

EP 0749135 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96401235 A

Priority

FR 9506963 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0749135A1] The push button (11) which actuates an electrical component e.g. a switch (10) includes a guiding body (12) mounted on a support (13) and a piston (14) sliding inside the body. A retaining ring (28) mounted on the guiding body is provided with a lug (29) which cooperates with two grooves (30A,B). The piston is actuated by a rod (19) provided with a head (18) and surrounded by a spring (20). The retaining ring is placed in a recess (35) defined between the body and a socket mounted on it. The socket is provided with two lugs which cooperate with two clips present on the body.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 3/022 (2013.01); H01H 2003/0246 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0749135 A1 19961218; EP 0749135 B1 20010516; DE 69612790 D1 20010621; DE 69612790 T2 20010830; ES 2156261 T3 20010616; FR 2735607 A1 19961220; FR 2735607 B1 19970822; US 5679936 A 19971021

INPADOC legal status


2013-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120611

2013-01-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110610

2011-07-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110520

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100622

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-01-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080611

2009-08-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080611

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080610

2009-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080610

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080613

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080613

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070612

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-06-15 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070615

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-05-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: FUMERO BREVETTI S.N.C.

2001-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69612790 20010621

2001-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2156261 T3

2001-06-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010516

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB IT LI SE

2000-09-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000816

1997-04-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970212

1996-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB IT LI SE