Global Patent Index - EP 0749176 B1

EP 0749176 B1 2002-09-18 - Planar and non-planar double C-patch antennas having different aperture shapes

Title (en)

Planar and non-planar double C-patch antennas having different aperture shapes

Title (de)

Ebene und nichtebene doppel-C-förmige Streifenleiterantennen mit unterschiedlichen Öffnungsformen

Title (fr)

Antennes planes et non-planes à microbande en forme de "double C" ayant différentes formes d'ouvertures

Publication

EP 0749176 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96304428 A

Priority

US 49077195 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0749176A1] A shorted, dual C-patch antenna includes a truncated ground plane, a layer of dielectric material having a first surface overlying the ground plane and an opposing second surface, and an electrically conductive layer overlying the second opposing surface of the dielectric layer. The electrically conductive layer forms a radiating patch and has a non-rectangularly shaped aperture (e.g., parabolic, triangular, pentagonal) having a length that extends along a first edge of the electrically conductive layer and a width that extends towards an oppositely disposed second edge. The length has a value that is equal to approximately 20% to approximately 35% of a length of the first edge. The antenna may further include electrically conductive vias or feedthroughs for shorting the electrically conductive layer to the ground plane at a region adjacent to a third edge of the electrically conductive layer. The antenna may be curved about one or more axes. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/24 (2006.01); H01Q 1/22 (2006.01); H01Q 9/04 (2006.01); H01Q 13/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/2275 (2013.01); H01Q 1/22 (2013.01); H01Q 9/0407 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0749176 A1 19961218; EP 0749176 B1 20020918; DE 69623697 D1 20021024; DE 69623697 T2 20030605; JP H09107229 A 19970422; KR 100371875 B1 20030410

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050613

2005-02-02 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040613

2005-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050101

2004-06-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040613

2004-04-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040227

2004-02-03 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-06-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030626

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-06-14 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030614

2003-06-11 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030611

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-03-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-12-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69623697 20021024

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-09-18 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-03-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOKIA CORPORATION

2001-01-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001214

1997-08-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970618

1996-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE