Global Patent Index - EP 0749179 B1

EP 0749179 B1 2000-01-12 - Screw clamp for electrical connector

Title (en)

Screw clamp for electrical connector

Title (de)

Schraubklemme für einen elektrischen Anschlu

Title (fr)

Borne à vis pour connecteur éléctrique

Publication

EP 0749179 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96890098 A

Priority

AT 103495 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0749179A1] The screw clamp has a first clamp plate (5) in the screw-in direction which is non-rotatable but axially displaceable. A second clamp plate (1) is fixed in a housing. The two clamp plates have coaxial threaded bores and opening distances shorter than the length of the shaft of a clamp bolt. The first clamp plate has lateral curved sprung flaps (10) which serve to clamp the head (13) of the clamp bolt (14) in its position which corresp. to the clamp being open. The flaps are of circular cross-section at their free ends.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/38 (2006.01); H01R 4/30 (2006.01); H01R 4/34 (2006.01); H01R 11/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/301 (2013.01); H01R 4/34 (2013.01); H01R 11/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0749179 A1 19961218; EP 0749179 B1 20000112; AT 1753 U1 19971027; AT 188811 T 20000115; AU 5597496 A 19970102; AU 694355 B2 19980716; BR 9602792 A 19980908; CA 2177346 A1 19961217; CA 2177346 C 20050816; CN 1075255 C 20011121; CN 1143843 A 19970226; DE 59604153 D1 20000217; DK 0749179 T3 20000508; ES 2143173 T3 20000501; GR 3033137 T3 20000831; JP 3833743 B2 20061018; JP H09129278 A 19970516; KR 100379806 B1 20030919; NZ 286514 A 19980126; PT 749179 E 20000428; US 5747741 A 19980505; ZA 9603777 B 19961125

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160608

2016-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160607

2016-10-03 [REG GR MA] RIGHT EXPIRED

- Document: GR 20000400830

- Effective date: 20160608

2016-09-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160926

2016-08-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160615

2016-08-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160606

2016-07-27 [REG IE MK9A] PATENT EXPIRED

2016-07-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 188811 T

- Effective date: 20160607

2016-06-29 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20160606

2016-06-15 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: MAXIMUM VALIDITY LIMIT REACHED

- Effective date: 20160607

2016-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-06-13 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

- Effective date: 20160607

2016-06-10 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20160606

2016-06-07 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59604153

2016-02-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150629

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150625

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150630

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150722

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150623

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150630

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20150625

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150626

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20150625

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150630

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150623

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150626

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20150625

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20150528

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20150624

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-06-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2000-12-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-05-08 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-05-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2143173 T3

2000-04-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-04-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-03-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2000-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604153 20000217

2000-01-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-01-14 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-01-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 188811 T 20000115

1999-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990324

1997-08-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970618

1996-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE