Global Patent Index - EP 0749184 B1

EP 0749184 B1 2000-01-26 - Lamp holder

Title (en)

Lamp holder

Title (de)

Lampenfassung

Title (fr)

Douille pour ampoule

Publication

EP 0749184 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96304346 A

Priority

GB 9512372 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0749184A2] An easy to assemble electrical connector, particularly for use in a lamp holder body, is provided. The electrical connector has two complementary body portions (10, 20) which fit together to form the connector, the first body portion (20) containing contact means (35, 36) for electrical contact between the connector and a target to be supplied with electrical current and the second body portion (10) containing retaining means to retain wires (30, 31) to supply current to the connector, whereby the wires (30, 31) can be maintained in electrical contact with the contact means (35, 36) when the body portions (10, 20) are fitted together, the retaining means comprising a plurality of slots (14), each slot (14) to receive one end of a wire (30, 31), and a channel (15) adjacent each slot (14) to receive a connector portion (34) of a conductor tag (32) attached to the end of the wire (30, 31) to be received in the respective slot (14), the connector portion (34) of the tag (32) extending substantially normally to the wire (30, 31). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/436; H01R 4/48; H01R 13/24; H01R 13/506; H01R 33/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/436 (2006.01); H01R 13/506 (2006.01); H01R 33/46 (2006.01); H01R 13/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 33/46 (2013.01); H01R 13/436 (2013.01); H01R 13/506 (2013.01); H01R 13/2421 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0749184 A2 19961218; EP 0749184 A3 19970903; EP 0749184 B1 20000126; AU 5589396 A 19970102; ES 2146359 T3 20000801; GB 2302459 A 19970115; GB 9512372 D0 19950816; NZ 286782 A 19970526

INPADOC legal status


2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010630

2005-06-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050610

2003-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20030303

2002-09-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2002-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020830

2002-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20010610

2001-06-11 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010611

2001-06-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010610

2001-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-09-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20000928

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2146359

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-07-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20000711

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-06-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20000628

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-04-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-04-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

1998-09-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980729

1998-01-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971120

1997-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

1997-08-27 [RHK1] MAIN CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RHK1

- IPC: H01R 13/436

1996-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT