Global patent index - EP 0749269 B1

EP 0749269 B1 2000-12-20 - Harmonic suppressor for an electronic ballast

Title (en)

Harmonic suppressor for an electronic ballast

Title (de)

Oberwellenfilter für ein elektronisches Vorschaltgerät

Title (fr)

Filtre d'harmoniques pour un ballast électronique

Publication

EP 0749269 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96660026 A

Priority

FI 952974 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0749269A2] The invention relates to a suppressor for an electronic ballast in a discharge lamp, which is connected between a ballast and a mains supply, including a supply-voltage rectifier (V1)) and a charging capacitor (C1), at least one energy-storing coil or inductance (L1) and an electronic switch element (V2) connected such that, when said switch element (V2) is conducting, a current path extends from the positive terminal of the rectifier (V1) through said switch and coil to its negative terminal and, when the switch (V2) is non-conducting, a current path extends from the positive terminal of the rectifier through a diode (V3) and the charging capacitor (C1) to its negative terminal. The switch element (V2) is controlled by means of a constant-frequency, permanent pulse-ratio control up to an operating point to be determined in view of a given momentary value of the mains voltage, whereafter the pulse ratio changes. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 41/288

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/28 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0749269 A2 19961218; EP 0749269 A3 19980401; EP 0749269 B1 20001220; DE 69611266 D1 20010125; DE 69611266 T2 20010426; FI 952974 A0 19950616; FI 97437 B 19960830; FI 97437 C 19961210

INPADOC legal status

2005-06-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050607

2004-04-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20040101

2004-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040227

2004-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20030607

2004-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040101

2004-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040101

2003-06-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030607

2002-05-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020523

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-05-22 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020522

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-05-20 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020520

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-05-13 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020513

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-03-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-01-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69611266

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-01-25

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2000-10-26 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-08-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 05B 41/288 A

2000-04-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000307

2000-04-12 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: HARMONIC SUPPRESSOR FOR AN ELECTRONIC BALLAST

2000-03-29 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: HARMONIC SUPPRESSOR FOR AN ELECTRONIC BALLAST

2000-03-22 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: HARMONIC SUPPRESSOR FOR AN ELECTRONIC BALLAST

2000-02-16 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: HARMONIC SUPPRESSOR FOR AN ELECTRONIC BALLAST

1999-12-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HELVAR OY AB

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1998-12-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19981001

1998-04-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

1996-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL