Global Patent Index - EP 0749314 A4

EP 0749314 A4 2002-09-18 - METHOD FOR TREATING AND INHIBITING GASTRIC AND DUODENAL ULCERS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR TREATING AND INHIBITING GASTRIC AND DUODENAL ULCERS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG UND INHIBIERUNG DER MAGEN- UND ZWÖLFFINGERDARMGESCHWÜREN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT ET D'INHIBITION DES ULCERES GASTRIQUES ET DUODENAUX

Publication

EP 0749314 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 95911945 A

Priority

  • US 9502388 W
  • US 20451594 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9523605A1] A method for treating and/or inhibiting gastric and duodenal ulcers, comprising administering a pharmaceutical composition comprising an oligosaccharide of the following formula (I): (NeuAc- alpha (2-3)-pGal- beta (1)-(-X-)m-(-Y-)n-)p-Z wherein X is a chemical bond or a group capable of linking the p galactose to either the linking group Y or the multivalent support Z; wherein the C1 glycosidic oxygen of galactose may be replaced by N, S or C; Y is a linking group; Z is a multivalent support; m is 0 or 1; n is 0 or 1; and p is an integer of 2-1,000 is described. Also described is a method for treating and/or inhibiting gastric and duodenal ulcers, comprising administering a pharmaceutical composition comprising an oligosaccharide of the formula (II): NeuAc- alpha (2-3)-pGal- beta (1)-A wherein A is a group capable of bonding to the p galactose; wherein the C1 glycosidic oxygen of galactose may be replaced by N, S or C.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/715; A61K 31/70; A61K 45/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07H 13/06 (2006.01); A61K 31/70 (2006.01); A61K 31/7012 (2006.01); A61K 31/702 (2006.01); A61K 31/7024 (2006.01); A61K 45/06 (2006.01); A61K 47/48 (2006.01); A61P 1/04 (2006.01); A61P 31/04 (2006.01); C07H 7/027 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/715 (2013.01); A61K 31/70 (2013.01); A61K 45/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] WO 9403184 A1 19940217 - NEOSE PHARM INC [US]
  • [A] WO 9318775 A1 19930930 - UNIV BRITISH COLUMBIA [CA]
  • [A] WO 9323055 A1 19931125 - UNIV BRITISH COLUMBIA [CA], et al
  • [A] FR 2662697 A1 19911206 - SNOW BRAND MILK PROD CO LTD [JP]
  • [A] FALK P ET AL: "AN IN VITRO ADHERENCE ASSAY REVEALS THAT HELICOBACTER PYLORI EXHIBITS CELL LINEAGE-SPECIFIC TROPISM IN THE HUMAN GASTRIC EPITHELIUM", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, US, vol. 90, no. 5, 1 March 1993 (1993-03-01), pages 2035 - 2039, XP000560389, ISSN: 0027-8424
  • See also references of WO 9523605A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9523605 A1 19950908; AU 1932395 A 19950918; AU 709149 B2 19990819; CA 2183329 A1 19950908; EP 0749314 A1 19961227; EP 0749314 A4 20020918; JP 3179108 B2 20010625; JP H09509931 A 19971007

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-07 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021022

2002-09-18 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020805

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 31/715 A, 7A 61K 31/70 B, 7A 61K 45/06 B

1997-06-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NEOSE TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

1996-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960828

1996-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE