Global Patent Index - EP 0749445 A4

EP 0749445 A4 2000-01-12 - ANTIBODIES WHICH BIND THE G-CSF RECEPTOR EXTRACELLULAR DOMAIN AND METHODS OF TREATMENT

Title (en)

ANTIBODIES WHICH BIND THE G-CSF RECEPTOR EXTRACELLULAR DOMAIN AND METHODS OF TREATMENT

Title (de)

ANTIKÖRPER, DIE DIE EXTRAZELLULÄRE DOMÄNE DES G-CSF REZEPTORS BINDEN, UND BEHANDLUNGSVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

ANTICORPS DE FIXANT AU DOMAINE EXTRACELLULAIRE DU RECEPTEUR DU FACTEUR DE CROISSANCE DES COLONIES DE GRANULOCYTES G-CSF ET PROCEDES DE TRAITEMENT

Publication

EP 0749445 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 95911669 A

Priority

  • AU PM375094 A
  • US 9501696 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9521864A1] The present invention relates generally to cytokine interactive molecules, such as antibodies and other immune reactive molecules, agonists and antagonists. The present invention also provides methods for assaying for the presence of cytokines or receptor associated proteins such as kinases and their function.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 16/24; A61K 39/395; A61K 39/44; A61K 49/00; C07K 16/28; C07K 16/46; C07K 17/00; G01N 33/566; G01N 33/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/53 (2006.01); A61K 39/395 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07K 16/28 (2006.01); C07K 16/42 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12P 21/08 (2006.01); G01N 33/566 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 16/2866 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [E] WO 9521867 A1 19950817 - LUDWIG INST CANCER RES [US], et al
  • [X] A. SUREDA ET AL.: "Analysis of granulocyte colony stimulating factor receptor expression on human cell lines and murine cells by means of a purified mAb.", TISSUE ANTIGENS, vol. 42, no. 4, 1993, Copenhagen, Denmark, pages 337, XP002122100
  • [X] V. BROUDY ET AL.: "Monoclonal antibody 4B10 (M33) recognizes stem cell factor (SCF), and antibody VIMD2b (M16) recognize the receptor for granulocyte colony stimulating factor (G-CSF).", TISSUE ANTIGENS, vol. 42, no. 4, 1993, Copenhagen, Denmark, pages 331, XP002122101
  • [X] J. LAYTON ET AL.: "The use of monoclonal antibodies and alanine substitution mutants to define the G-CSF receptor-binding site.", LYMPHOKINE AND CYTOKINE RESEARCH, vol. 12, no. 5, 1993, New York, NY, USA, pages 327, XP002122102
  • [PX] J. LI ET AL.: "Growth-stimulation and differentiation-promotion mediated by granulocyte colony-stimulating factor receptor in different hematopoietic cell lines.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, vol. 35, March 1994 (1994-03-01), USA, pages 565, XP002122103
  • See also references of WO 9521864A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9521864 A1 19950817; AU PM375094 D0 19940303; CA 2182494 A1 19950817; EP 0749445 A1 19961227; EP 0749445 A4 20000112; JP H09508799 A 19970909

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030902

2000-07-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000613

2000-01-12 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19991126

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-12-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 6C 07K 16/24 A, 6C 07K 16/28 B, 6C 07K 16/46 B, 6C 07K 17/00 B, 6G 01N 33/566 B, 6G 01N 33/58 B, 6A 61K 39/395 B, 6A 61K 39/44 B, 6A 61K 49/00 B

1996-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960905

1996-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE