Global Patent Index - EP 0749709 B1

EP 0749709 B1 2001-05-02 - A connecting element for arm bands

Title (en)

A connecting element for arm bands

Title (de)

Verbindungselement für Armbänder

Title (fr)

Elément de connexion pour bracelet

Publication

EP 0749709 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96101185 A

Priority

IT VI950099 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0749709A1] The invention discloses a connecting element (1) for arm bands consisting of links suited to join the central links (41) of an arm band with the corresponding lateral links (42, 43) arranged by their sides, comprising a tubular element (2) coupled with a through hole (410) drilled in each of said central links (41) and a pin (3) inserted in said tubular element (2) and presenting its protruding extremities (310) which couple with a corresponding dead hole (420, 430) drilled in the corresponding lateral link (42, 43). Said pin (3) is equipped with at least three lobes (150) which develop following its axial direction and that give to the transversal section of said pin (3) a bulging profile formed by at least three reciprocally intersecting arches (50). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A44C 5/02; A44C 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44C 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A44C 5/107 (2013.01); A44C 5/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0749709 A1 19961227; EP 0749709 B1 20010502; DE 69612642 D1 20010607; DE 69612642 T2 20011206; IT 1280522 B1 19980122; IT VI950099 A1 19961223; IT VI950099 D0 19950622

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150202

2015-10-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150930

2015-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150121

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150109

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140123

- Year of fee payment: 19

2010-04-30 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20091201

2005-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050129

2003-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030801

2002-04-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-02-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020227

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-09-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2001-07-17 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO ING. E. BONINI S.R.L.

2001-06-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69612642 20010607

2001-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

2001-02-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PROMOTION SPA

1999-06-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990503

1999-06-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PROMOTION SRL

1997-04-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970211

1996-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI