Global patent index - EP 0749710 B1

EP 0749710 B1 2000-03-22 - Worktable, in particular for a medical or dental laboratory

Title (en)

Worktable, in particular for a medical or dental laboratory

Title (de)

Arbeitstisch für ein insbesondere medizinisches oder dentales Labor

Title (fr)

Table de travail, en particulier pour un laboratoire médicale ou dentaire

Publication

EP 0749710 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96109886 A

Priority

DE 19522183 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5791260A] In a worktable (1) for an in particular medical or dental laboratory, having a work station (7) on the forward region of its tabletop (2), at which a working device (5) is arranged, which is moveable on a guide framework (12, 13, 14) between an in-use position located above the tabletop (2) and a not-in-use position arranged under the table surface (2a), the guide framework has a carrier arm (12) arranged under the tabletop (2) extending approximately horizontally, which arm is mounted in its rear region pivotably on the worktable (1), around pivot axis (17a) extending horizontally and transversely. A guide element (24) is provided at a spacing forwardly from the pivot axis (17a) which guide element is displaceably guided in a guide path (14) that extends from a rear guide path end initially approximately horizontally (14a) forwardly and then in particular curvedly extends upwardly (14b), whereby the guide element (24) is positionable in the upper region of the guide path and whereby the carrier arm (12) is telescopable in the region between the pivot axis (17a) and the guide element (24) or is guided at its rear end in a further, horizontally extending guide (13, 16).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 21/03; B25H 1/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 37/00 (2006.01); B08B 15/04 (2006.01); B25H 1/02 (2006.01); B25H 1/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B08B 15/04 (2013.01); A47B 37/00 (2013.01); B25H 1/02 (2013.01); B25H 1/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE IT

EPO simple patent family

US 5791260 A 19980811; AT 190810 T 20000415; DE 19522183 A1 19970109; DE 19522183 C2 20010510; EP 0749710 A1 19961227; EP 0749710 B1 20000322

INPADOC legal status

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090619

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080624

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080620

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070622

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-06-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070629

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-06-19 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060619

2005-06-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050628

- Year of fee payment: 10

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-08-18 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-05-16 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUGNION S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59604730

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-27

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE IT

2000-03-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 190810

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1998-04-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980312

1997-04-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970204

1996-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE IT