Global patent index - EP 0749720 B1

EP 0749720 B1 2000-01-19 - Method of regenerating a water-softening installation for an automatic washing machine or dishwasher

Title (en)

Method of regenerating a water-softening installation for an automatic washing machine or dishwasher

Title (de)

Regenerationsverfahren einer Wasserenthärtungsanlage für eine Wasch-oder Geschirrspülmaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé de régénération d'un adoucisseur d'eau pour une machine à laver ou lave-vaisselle

Publication

EP 0749720 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96109227 A

Priority

DE 19522140 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0749720A1] The invention relates to a water-softening installation for an automatic washing machine or dishwasher, in which the wash or rinse container (10) is connected with a water softener (16) filled with active resin (17), into which softener, in intake phases, fresh water can be led for softening via a software-driven intake valve (1), a storage container (2) and a water supply pipe and into which saline solution (7) for regenerating the resin can be led, by means of a software-driven regeneration valve (M), from a saline solution container (7) which is supplied with fresh water from the storage container (2), with, in the regeneration phase, activation of the regeneration valve (14) being followed by at least brief activation of the intake valve (1). The regeneration process is improved and optimized by the fact that a non-return valve (20) is connected after the regeneration valve (14) between the storage container (2) and the saline solution container (7) and this non-return valve (20) is only permeable in the direction towards the water softener and at the outlet side is connected with the entrance of the water softener and the water supply pipe connected thereto, and by the fact that, in the regeneration phase, when the intake valve is opened and the regeneration valve remains closed, an air-pressure pulse occurs in the water supply pipe. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 15/42; D06F 39/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/42 (2006.01); D06F 39/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/4229 (2013.01); D06F 39/007 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0749720 A1 19961227; EP 0749720 B1 20000119; DE 19522140 A1 19970102; DE 19522140 C2 19980813; DE 19522140 C3 20000615

INPADOC legal status

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160607

2016-06-29 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20160607

2016-06-08 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69606230

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150625

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150608

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150602

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150603

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-06-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110609

2012-02-07 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100609

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-01-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-05-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-03-07 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. A. GIAMBROCONO & C. S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69606230

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-02-24

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2000-01-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MUELLER, KARL-HEINZ

1999-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990318

1997-08-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970609

1996-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE