Global Patent Index - EP 0749789 B1

EP 0749789 B1 2001-05-09 - Continuous casting machine with heatable multichamber furnace comprising a dependent mould

Title (en)

Continuous casting machine with heatable multichamber furnace comprising a dependent mould

Title (de)

Stranggiessanlage mit einem beheizbaren Mehrkammerofen mit ofenabhängiger Kokille

Title (fr)

Machine de coulée continue avec four chauffable à chambres multiples comprenant une coquille dépendant du four

Publication

EP 0749789 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96250133 A

Priority

DE 19523715 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19523715C1] Molten metal is continuously cast in a horizontal continuous casting plant with a multi-chamber heatable furnace (1) to which a mould arrangement (5) is attached, mounted statically on a support frame (10) independent of the furnace. The furnace itself is dynamically supported on a weighing equipment (6), forming a measuring element connected to a pressure generating device (11). The mould arrangement and the furnace are connected via a compressible seal. During discontinuous, intermittent withdrawal of the strand, the weighing equipment is pref. operative for measurement while the withdrawal device is inoperative.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/14; B22D 11/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/04 (2006.01); B22D 11/10 (2006.01); B22D 11/14 (2006.01); B22D 11/16 (2006.01); B22D 11/18 (2006.01); B22D 39/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/183 (2013.01); B22D 11/143 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FI FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19523715 C1 19961010; AT 200993 T 20010515; BR 9602847 A 19990803; EP 0749789 A1 19961227; EP 0749789 B1 20010509; JP 3727415 B2 20051214; JP H0910894 A 19970114; TW 330163 B 19980421; US 5873403 A 19990223

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130614

2014-05-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130614

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130630

2014-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130630

2014-03-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59606864

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-02-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 200993 T

- Effective date: 20130614

2014-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120613

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120628

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120622

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20120622

- Year of fee payment: 17

2007-10-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

- Free text: SMS DEMAG AG#EDUARD-SCHLOEMANN-STRASSE 4#40237 DUESSELDORF (DE) -TRANSFER TO- SMS DEMAG AG#EDUARD-SCHLOEMANN-STRASSE 4#40237 DUESSELDORF (DE)

2006-03-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-03-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050614

2006-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2005-06-14 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050614

2005-06-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050614

2004-06-09 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040609

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-06-02 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20040602

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-05-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040528

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-07-20 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: GUZZI E RAVIZZA S.R.L.

2001-06-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606864 20010613

2001-05-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010509

2001-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FI FR GB IT LI

2001-05-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 200993 T 20010515

2000-02-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

1997-09-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970724

1997-08-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970620

1997-03-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ROLLER, ERLING, DR.-ING.

1997-03-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PHILLIPPS, GUENTER

1996-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FI FR GB IT LI