Global Patent Index - EP 0749790 B1

EP 0749790 B1 2000-08-23 - Apparatus for casting a directionally solidified article

Title (en)

Apparatus for casting a directionally solidified article

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Herstellung eines gerichtet erstarrten Giesskörpers

Title (fr)

Appareil pour la fabrication par coulage d'une pièce solidifiée directionellement

Publication

EP 0749790 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96810192 A

Priority

  • DE 19522266 A
  • DE 19539770 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0749790A1] In the prodn. of a casting (20) in a vacuum chamber (2), a mould (12) with molten alloy is transferred, through a hole (7) in a separating baffle (3), from a heating chamber (4) into a cooling chamber (5) in which the alloy solidifies in an oriented manner. The method is characterised by the fact that below the baffle(3) the mould is additionally cooled from outside by means of a gas flow. Also claimed is an appts. for implementation of the method. The appts. is characterised by the presence of means for producing and directing a gas flow in the cooling chamber below the baffle (3). The gas used for cooling the mould is an inert gas such as, in particular, argon or helium. The gas is introduced into the cooling chamber (5) after entry of the bottom of the mould (12). The gas is directed in the direction of the mould surface, and is then removed from the vacuum chamber (2). The gas is cooled, filtered and again introduced into the cooling chamber.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 27/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/12 (2006.01); B22D 23/00 (2006.01); B22D 27/04 (2006.01); C22C 19/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 27/045 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0749790 A1 19961227; EP 0749790 B1 20000823; EP 0749790 B2 20041103; EA 199600020 A2 19961231; EA 199600020 A3 19970331; JP 3919256 B2 20070523; JP H0910919 A 19970114

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GENERAL ELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY GMBH, CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59605783

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2016-08-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59605783

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: ROESLER, UWE, DIPL.-PHYS.UNIV., DE

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160325

2016-04-20 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20160325

2016-03-26 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 59605783

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150320

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150327

- Year of fee payment: 20

2005-09-23 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET3

2005-02-23 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBTA

2004-11-03 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-03-31 [RTI2] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI2

- Free Format Text: APPARATUS FOR CASTING A DIRECTIONALLY SOLIDIFIED ARTICLE

2004-03-24 [RTI2] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI2

- Free Format Text: APPARATUS FOR CASTING A DIRECTIONALLY SOLIDIFIED ARTICLE

2004-01-14 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2003-08-22 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

2003-08-22 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-12 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SCHWEIZ) AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2001-07-18 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: SIEMENS AG

- Effective date: 20010523

2000-12-27 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ALSTOM POWER (SCHWEIZ) AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2000-11-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-11-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20001031

2000-11-10 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-09-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59605783

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-09-28

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-06-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB ALSTOM POWER (SCHWEIZ) AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1998-11-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980921

1997-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970509

1996-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT