Global Patent Index - EP 0749830 B1

EP 0749830 B1 2000-04-05 - Process of binding a book with a hardcover

Title (en)

Process of binding a book with a hardcover

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Binden eines Buches mit steifem Buchdeckel

Title (fr)

Procédé de reliure d'un livre avec couverture rigide

Publication

EP 0749830 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95109627 A

Priority

EP 95109627 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0749830A1] An apparatus is described for printing characters upon a book cover with foils and comprises a character image forming section (1) for forming an image signal of characters to be printed, a character printing section (2) for printing characters upon the blank material (3) to be used as the book cover in toner in response to the character signals which have been formed, and a foil adhesion section (6) where foil sheets (5) each having an improved adhesive characteristic relate to toners is superimposed upon the front blank material (3) with the characters printed and then the foil sheet (5) is heated and compressed on the book cover. The foil printing operation may be completed by peeling away the foil sheet (5) from the cover sheet (4) which has been taken out of the foil-applying section (6). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 17/02; B42C 7/00; G03G 8/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 17/02 (2006.01); B42C 7/00 (2006.01); G03G 8/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 17/02 (2013.01); B42C 7/009 (2013.01); G03G 8/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0749830 A1 19961227; EP 0749830 B1 20000405; DE 69516125 D1 20000511

INPADOC legal status


2002-02-13 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010621

2001-06-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010621

2001-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-20 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20001220

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-09-01 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-07-06 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000706

2000-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69516125 20000511

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-04-05 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000405

1998-02-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19971219

1997-09-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970701

1996-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB