Global Patent Index - EP 0749881 B1

EP 0749881 B1 2001-01-03 - Railway vehicles for an optimised use of the clearance gauge of railway tracks

Title (en)

Railway vehicles for an optimised use of the clearance gauge of railway tracks

Title (de)

Schienenfahrzeuge für eine optimierte Ausnutzung des Lichtraumprofils von Bahngleisen

Title (fr)

Véhicules ferroviaires permettant une utilisation optimisée du gabarit des voies ferrées

Publication

EP 0749881 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96470015 A

Priority

FR 9507798 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0749881A1] The rail vehicle has a chassis (19) which has towards each of its ends a pivoted bogey (11). The bogey pivot comprises two rods (41,42) which are arranged so that the bogie pivots about a fictitious axis (16) moved backwards to the vehicle middle. A control (50) angularly positions the bogey relative to the chassis about the pivot axis as a function of the angle between the vehicle longitudinal axis (17) and the track direction at the vehicle end supported by the bogey. The pivoting rods are located either side the vehicle axis and connect the chassis to a bogey support plate (40). The rods are pivoted on the chassis and on the plate and extend in the respective convergent directions (47,48). The intersection point of these directions is displaced towards the middle of the vehicle.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61F 5/44; B61F 5/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61F 5/42 (2006.01); B61F 5/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61F 5/42 (2013.01); B61F 5/44 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI LU

EPO simple patent family

EP 0749881 A1 19961227; EP 0749881 B1 20010103; AT 198451 T 20010115; DE 69611399 D1 20010208; DE 69611399 T2 20010523; FR 2735740 A1 19961227; FR 2735740 B1 19970822

INPADOC legal status


2002-04-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020403

2002-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020228

2002-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: LANGE SEBASTIEN

- Effective date: 20010630

2001-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: DE DIETRICH ET CIE

- Effective date: 20010630

2001-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010630

2001-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010630

2001-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010630

2001-06-21 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010621

2001-06-21 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010621

2001-02-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69611399 20010208

2001-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI LU

2001-01-03 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20010103

2001-01-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010103

2001-01-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 198451 T 20010115

1997-08-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970620

1997-02-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961209

1996-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI LU