Global Patent Index - EP 0750080 B1

EP 0750080 B1 2000-03-22 - Structures

Title (en)

Structures

Title (de)

Bauweisen

Title (fr)

Structures

Publication

EP 0750080 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96114528 A

Priority

  • EP 92310547 A
  • GB 9215332 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2268765A] A hollow roofing panel (10) of plastics material comprises one or more hollow ducts (22) and has at opposite sides thereof lower coupling members (24, 26), whereby elements may be connected to each other directly or indirectly, wherein the ducts are generally rectangular and formed between generally flat bottom and top walls (12 and 18 respectively) and vertical end (14) and intermediate walls. A stiffering beam (40), e.g. of aluminium engages the lower coupling members (24, 26, and also upper formations (32, 52) and has a barbed groove (50) for retaining a capping (60) with flexible edges (62) and resilient projections (64) for engaging the barbs. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 3/28; E04C 2/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04C 2/54 (2006.01); E04D 3/06 (2006.01); E04D 3/08 (2006.01); E04D 3/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 3/06 (2013.01); E04C 2/543 (2013.01); E04D 3/08 (2013.01); E04D 3/28 (2013.01); E04D 2003/0825 (2013.01); E04D 2003/085 (2013.01); E04D 2003/285 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK LI

EPO simple patent family

GB 2268765 A 19940119; GB 2268765 B 19970122; GB 9313948 D0 19930818; DE 69227030 D1 19981022; DE 69227030 T2 19990318; DE 69230839 D1 20000427; DE 69230839 T2 20000727; DK 0602289 T3 19990614; DK 0750080 T3 20000710; EP 0602289 A1 19940622; EP 0602289 B1 19980916; EP 0750080 A1 19961227; EP 0750080 B1 20000322; GB 2300012 A 19961023; GB 2300012 B 19970122; GB 9215332 D0 19920902; GB 9613271 D0 19960828

INPADOC legal status


2007-07-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-07-02 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2007-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070601

2006-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-04-19 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20060419

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-04-13 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060413

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-04-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060413

- Year of fee payment: 14

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-18 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-07-10 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69230839 20000427

2000-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSBUERO JEAN HUNZIKER

2000-03-22 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 602289

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK LI

1999-04-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990308

1998-03-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ULTRAFRAME (UK) LIMITED

1997-08-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970623

1996-12-27 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 602289

1996-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK LI