Global Patent Index - EP 0750083 B1

EP 0750083 B1 2000-05-10 - Driving vehicle, specially cleaning robot, in particular for swimming pools with means for automatically changing the driving direction in front of an obstacle

Title (en)

Driving vehicle, specially cleaning robot, in particular for swimming pools with means for automatically changing the driving direction in front of an obstacle

Title (de)

Fahrzeug, insbesondere Reinigungsroboter für Schwimmbäder mit automatischer Fahrtrichtungsänderung vor einem Hindernis

Title (fr)

Véhicule roulant, notamment robot de nettoyage en particulier de piscine, à changement automatique de direction de déplacement devant un obstacle

Publication

EP 0750083 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96401298 A

Priority

FR 9507297 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0750083A1] The robot has two independent rear driving wheels (1). It has two obstacle detection arms (2) located on each of its front sides. Each driving wheel is driven from a drive shaft (8) through a rotation inverter. A connector (7) is interposed between each detector and the wheel drive. The obstacle detectors and the connector are arranged so that, when the vehicle encounters an obstacle, the detector activated by the obstacle activates the inverter so as to change rotation of the drive wheel from forwards to rearwards. Each obstacle detector arm is in the shape of a moustache. It has an active edge (3) projecting frontwards and extending over the vehicle half-width and the corresponding corner of the vehicle is opposite the drive wheel to which the arm is functionally associated. The arm opposite end (6) is located near the drive wheel which it controls and is supported to rotate freely on a vertical rotational axis (5).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 4/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04H 4/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 4/1654 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0750083 A1 19961227; EP 0750083 B1 20000510; AT 192821 T 20000515; AU 5604796 A 19970109; AU 704603 B2 19990429; CA 2179482 A1 19961220; DE 69608168 D1 20000615; DE 69608168 T2 20010111; ES 2146366 T3 20000801; FR 2735437 A1 19961220; FR 2735437 B1 19970814; US 5771987 A 19980630; ZA 9605184 B 19970123

INPADOC legal status


2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090615

2010-08-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090615

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-03-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100226

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090101

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081006

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20081007

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-08-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070830

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-06-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050614

2002-06-14 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020614

2002-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020101

2002-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020101

2001-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: ZODIAC POOL CARE EUROPE

- Effective date: 20010630

2001-09-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20010928

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010630

2001-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2146366 T3

2000-07-03 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

2000-07-03 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20000703

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-06-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20000629

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-06-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69608168 20000615

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR IT NL

2000-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 192821 T 20000515

1999-08-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ZODIAC POOL CARE EUROPE

1998-12-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981102

1997-08-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970605

1996-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR IT NL