Global Patent Index - EP 0750092 B1

EP 0750092 B1 2000-09-27 - Roll-up device for venetian blinds

Title (en)

Roll-up device for venetian blinds

Title (de)

Aufrollvorrichtung für Jalousien

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'enroulement motorisé pour stores vénitiens

Publication

EP 0750092 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96810355 A

Priority

FR 9507406 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0750092A1] The cord winding system for a Venetian blind comprises an electric motor (2) and a reducer housed in a casing (1). The reducer output shafts (3,4) drive two winding drums (12,14) on which the cords (13,15) are wound. A stop for when the blind is unwound by a desired amount is constituted by a screw (6) mounted coaxially and rotating with the output shaft in a cylindrical cage (9). A floating nut (7) on the screw is prevented from rotating in the cage. Motor stoppage for the completely unwound position of the blind is ensured by the blind abutting against the casing. Stopping of the blind is caused by the abutment of the nut against a stop fixed to the cage. Adjustment of the bottom stopping point is made by unlocking the cage and its rotational drive. Rotational locking of the cage in the casing is constituted by a transverse gear screw (17) meshing with a cage helicoidal tooth (16).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/322; E06B 9/308; E06B 9/88

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/264 (2006.01); E06B 9/308 (2006.01); E06B 9/322 (2006.01); E06B 9/56 (2006.01); E06B 9/82 (2006.01); E06B 9/88 (2006.01); G05D 3/12 (2006.01); E06B 9/80 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/88 (2013.01); E06B 9/308 (2013.01); E06B 9/322 (2013.01); E06B 2009/6854 (2013.01); E06B 2009/6881 (2013.01); Y10S 160/17 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0750092 A1 19961227; EP 0750092 B1 20000927; DE 69610463 D1 20001102; DE 69610463 T2 20010510; ES 2104539 T1 19971016; FR 2735812 A1 19961227; FR 2735812 B1 19970822; JP 3481776 B2 20031222; JP H0925776 A 19970128; US 5699847 A 19971223

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120630

2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120630

2013-04-18 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69610463

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120603

2013-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2013-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2013-01-16 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20130101

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110629

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110711

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110627

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110524

- Year of fee payment: 16

2001-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SOMFY

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20010630

2001-09-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010630

2001-03-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010329

2001-03-28 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20000927

2000-11-17 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUGNION S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-11-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69610463

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-11-02

2000-10-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: BUGNION S.A.

2000-09-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES GB IT LI NL

2000-09-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000927

1999-12-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19991013

1997-10-16 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: BA2A

- Ref Document Number: 2104539

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T1

1997-08-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970616

1996-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES GB IT LI NL