Global patent index - EP 0750105 B1

EP 0750105 B1 2000-04-19 - A method of and an apparatus for calibrating a rotary position transducer

Title (en)

A method of and an apparatus for calibrating a rotary position transducer

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Kalibrieren eines Drehgebers

Title (fr)

Méthode et appareil d'étalonnage d'un capteur de position rotatif

Publication

EP 0750105 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96303794 A

Priority

GB 9512652 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0750105A1] A rotary position transducer comprises a rotary element such as a wheel (1) having a plurality of markers such as teeth (3, 4, 5, 6). A sensor (2), for instance of the variable reluctance type, produces a position signal when each marker (3, 4, 5, 6) passes. In order to calibrate the transducer, the rotary element (1) is rotated with substantially constant deceleration. First time periods between consecutive position signals are measured for a first revolution of the rotary element (1). Second time periods between consecutive position signals are measured for a second revolution subsequent to the first. Corrected angular spacings are then determined from the first and second time periods. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/009 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0750105 A1 19961227; EP 0750105 B1 20000419; DE 69607788 D1 20000525; DE 69607788 T2 20001116; GB 9512652 D0 19950823

INPADOC legal status

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160527

2016-06-22 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20160527

2016-05-28 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69607788

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150601

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150512

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150518

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150508

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-06-01 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2005-11-04 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-04-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-07-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-05-30 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUGNION S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69607788

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-25

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990219

1997-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970513

1996-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT