Global Patent Index - EP 0750116 B1

EP 0750116 B1 2001-05-23 - Control method for displacement-type fluid machine, and apparatus thereof

Title (en)

Control method for displacement-type fluid machine, and apparatus thereof

Title (de)

Verfahren für die Regelung von Verdrängungstyp-Fluidmaschinen und Einrichtung hierfür

Title (fr)

Procédé de réglage pour le déplacement des machines de type fluide et dispositif pour celui-ci

Publication

EP 0750116 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96109849 A

Priority

JP 17542995 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0750116A1] A method and an apparatus for controlling a displacement-type fluid machine which handles fluid including gas and/or liquid for increasing or decreasing pressure of the fluid or transporting the fluid, comprising: provision of an alternating current motor for driving the displacement-type fluid machine; and provision of a frequency converter which is capable of conducting frequency conversion up to a range higher than the power source frequency to adjust the number of revolutions of the motor; wherein the number of revolutiong is adjusted so that input current to the motor is kept constant, regardless of any change in operating pressure of the displacement-type fluid machine, whereby the displacement-type fluid machine is operated maintaining the process values within an allowable limit without effecting repeated actuation and stopping of the machine.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 49/06; H02P 5/34; H02P 7/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 15/00 (2006.01); F04B 49/20 (2006.01); F04C 14/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04C 14/08 (2013.01); F04B 49/20 (2013.01); F04B 2203/0204 (2013.01); F04C 2270/01 (2013.01); F04C 2270/075 (2013.01); F04C 2270/095 (2013.01); F04C 2270/40 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0750116 A1 19961227; EP 0750116 B1 20010523; DE 69612911 D1 20010628; DE 69612911 T2 20020328; JP H094591 A 19970107

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080619

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090101

2009-04-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090228

2009-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080619

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070608

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070613

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-06-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070614

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69612911 20010628

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990315

1997-08-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970625

1996-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB