Global Patent Index - EP 0750157 B1

EP 0750157 B1 2002-12-18 - Improved motor vehicle headlamp of the elliptical type

Title (en)

Improved motor vehicle headlamp of the elliptical type

Title (de)

Verbesserter Kfz-Scheinwerfer elliptischen Types

Title (fr)

Projecteur du genre elliptique à construction perfectionnée pour véhicule automobile

Publication

EP 0750157 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96401350 A

Priority

FR 9507488 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0750157A2] The headlamp comprises a lamp (La) and an elliptically shaped mirror (M). The mirror has a first focus in the vicinity of the lamp and a second focus further forwards w.r.t. the optical axis of the device. A converging lens (Le) is focused in the region of the second mirror focus point. A mounting ring (B) is solidly attached to the leading edge of the mirror, and a lamp carrier is formed at the rear part of the mirror in order to support the lamp (La). The mirror, the lens mounting ring and the lamp carrier are formed in two pieces (100,200) which are fitted together in a direction (F2) which is perpendicular to the optical axis of the lamp. Each of the two pieces defines a section of mirror (M',M"), a section of lens mounting ring (B',B") and a section of the lamp carrier (PL',PL").

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21S 8/12; F21V 7/00; F21V 11/16; F21V 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/12 (2006.01); F21V 7/00 (2006.01); F21V 11/16 (2006.01); F21V 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 41/55 (2018.01); F21S 41/295 (2018.01); F21S 41/321 (2018.01); F21S 41/43 (2018.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0750157 A2 19961227; EP 0750157 A3 19970528; EP 0750157 B1 20021218; DE 69625409 D1 20030130; DE 69625409 T2 20031030; ES 2188732 T3 20030701; FR 2735849 A1 19961227; FR 2735849 B1 19970822

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130621

2014-07-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140708

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-04-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69625409

- Effective date: 20140101

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120625

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120622

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-06-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050620

2005-02-09 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040620

2004-06-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040620

2003-12-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030919

2003-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2188732 T3

2003-06-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030613

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-04-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030307

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69625409 20030130

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69625409 P 20030130

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2002-12-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 21S 8/12 A, 7F 21V 7/00 B, 7F 21V 11/16 B, 7F 21V 17/00 B

2001-03-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010124

1998-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971103

1997-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

1996-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT