Global Patent Index - EP 0750225 B1

EP 0750225 B1 2000-10-04 - Use of hydroxamic acid derivatives for reducing the amount of residual sensitizing dyes after development processing

Title (en)

Use of hydroxamic acid derivatives for reducing the amount of residual sensitizing dyes after development processing

Title (de)

Verwendung von Hydroxamsaüre Derivate zum reduzieren der Restmenge an Sensibilisierungsfarbstoffen nach der Entwicklungsverarbeitung

Title (fr)

Utilisation de dérivés de l'acide hydroxyamique pour réduire la quantité résiduelle de colorants sensibilisateurs après le traitement de développement

Publication

EP 0750225 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96109407 A

Priority

JP 16782595 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0750225A1] A method for reducing residual sensitizing dyes after development processing of a silver halide color photographic material comprising a support having thereon at least one silver halide emulsion layer, which comprises incorporating a compound represented by formula (I): <CHEM> wherein R<1> represents a hydrogen atom, a substituted or unsubstituted alkyl group or a substituted or unsubstituted aryl group; R<2> represents a substituted or unsubstituted alkyl group, a substituted or unsubstituted aryl group, a substituted or unsubstituted alkylamino group, a substituted or unsubstituted arylamino group, a substituted or unsubstituted alkoxy group, a substituted or unsubstituted aryloxy group, or a substituted or unsubstituted heterocyclic group, into the silver halide color photographic material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 7/392

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03C 7/392 (2006.01); G03C 7/396 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 7/39236 (2013.01); G03C 7/39248 (2013.01); G03C 7/396 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0750225 A1 19961227; EP 0750225 B1 20001004; DE 69610530 D1 20001109; DE 69610530 T2 20010517

INPADOC legal status


2012-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120103

2012-04-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69610530

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120103

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100519

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20010612

2001-09-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-06-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010612

2001-03-02 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2001-03-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2000-11-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69610530

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-11-09

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

2000-10-04 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001004

2000-10-04 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001004

2000-10-04 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001004

1999-12-01 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: USE OF HYDROXAMIC ACID DERIVATIVES FOR REDUCING THE AMOUNT OF RESIDUAL SENSITIZING DYES AFTER DEVELOPMENT PROCESSING

1999-09-29 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: USE OF HYDROXYAMIC DERIVATIVES FOR REDUCING RESIDUAL SENSITIZING DYES AFTER DEVELOPMENT PROCESSING

1997-10-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19970909

1997-03-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970110

1996-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL