Global Patent Index - EP 0750365 B1

EP 0750365 B1 2000-10-04 - Anchor for underwater electrodes

Title (en)

Anchor for underwater electrodes

Title (de)

Anker für Unterwasserelektroden

Title (fr)

Ancre pour des électrodes sous-marines

Publication

EP 0750365 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96850113 A

Priority

SE 9502263 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0750365A1] The invention relates to an anchor (1), comprising a cavity structure (10) with a top surface (2) and essentially vertical wall means (4) extending downwards from said top surface (2) to form a cavity (10). The anchor has at least one sealable opening (5) in its top surface, and it is provided with means (8) for allowing supply of low density fluid, e.g. gas, to the interior of said cavity structure. It further comprises a bottom surface (3) with an opening (6) or openings for enabling sea water to enter said cavity (10) when the anchor is immersed. The top surface (2) extends in the horizontal plane beyond the periphery of said wall means (4) to form a circumferential flange (11). There is provided a similar flange (12) at the lower end of said wall means (4), said wall means (4) and said flanges (11, 12) thereby forming a receiving portion (13) on said anchor for receiving a windable member (14) therein. It also relates to an electrode station comprising an anchor and electrodes wound onto said anchor. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 3/08; H02G 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 3/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GR IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0750365 A1 19961227; EP 0750365 B1 20001004; DE 69610531 D1 20001109; DE 69610531 T2 20010531; GR 3035071 T3 20010330; NO 962414 A 19961223; NO 962414 D0 19960607; PL 314906 A1 19961223; SE 506692 C2 19980202; SE 9502263 D0 19950621; SE 9502263 L 19961222

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050614

2002-04-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020403

2002-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020101

2002-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020228

2002-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020101

2001-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: PERMASCAND A.B.

- Effective date: 20010630

2001-12-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011231

2001-09-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010630

2000-12-22 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

2000-11-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-11-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69610531 20001109

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GR IT NL

2000-02-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991220

1997-08-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970604

1996-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GR IT NL