Global Patent Index - EP 0750444 B1

EP 0750444 B1 2001-12-05 - Radiant heater and method for its manufacture

Title (en)

Radiant heater and method for its manufacture

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Strahlungsheizkörpers und Strahlungsheizkörper

Title (fr)

Corps de chauffe rayonnant et son procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 0750444 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96109730 A

Priority

DE 19522798 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0750444A1] The method involves pressing a heat barrier film (15) in a special form as a tablet (12) of disposable heat resistant material with an essentially flat surface. The heat conductor (17) is attached to the surface with partial embedding in the heat barrier material. The tablet is placed in an empty carrier shell (23) as a one-piece heat barrier. The partial embedding is performed in the vicinity of protruding attachment feet (22) of the heat conductor. The hear conductor is placed in an insertion tool (16) and pressed into the surface of the tablet with its embedded parts.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 3/74

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/748 (2013.01); H05B 2203/017 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49083 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0750444 A1 19961227; EP 0750444 B1 20011205; EP 0750444 B2 20060412; AT 210363 T 20011215; DE 19522798 A1 19970102; DE 59608342 D1 20020117; ES 2169175 T3 20020701; ES 2169175 T5 20061116; SI 0750444 T1 20020430; SI 0750444 T2 20060831; TR 199600520 A2 19970321; US 5834740 A 19981110

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120619

2013-10-21 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20131021

2013-06-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120618

2013-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120630

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120702

2013-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120630

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120618

2013-03-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-02-28 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20130125

2013-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120619

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120618

2013-02-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120618

2013-02-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 210363 T

- Effective date: 20120618

2013-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-01-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110627

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110620

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110621

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-07-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110622

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110623

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110629

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110630

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20101028

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100624

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-11-13 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: E.G.O. ELEKTRO-GERAETEBAU GMBH

- Free text: E.G.O. ELEKTRO-GERAETEBAU GMBH#ROTE-TOR-STRASSE#D-75038 OBERDERDINGEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- E.G.O. ELEKTRO-GERAETEBAU GMBH#ROTE-TOR-STRASSE#D-75038 OBERDERDINGEN (DE)

2006-12-15 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2006-11-16 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

2006-05-03 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2006-05-02 [REG SE RPEO] EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED IN MODIFIED FORM AFTER OPPOSITION AT EPO

2006-04-28 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2006-04-12 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20060412

2006-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2006-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: SI

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2003-07-09 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: FAGOR, S.COOP

- Effective date: 20020723

2002-09-18 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: FAGOR, S.COOP

- Effective date: 20020723

2002-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2169175 T3

2002-05-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-02-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020206

2002-02-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ZIMMERLI, WAGNER & PARTNER AG

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59608342 20020117

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19960618

2001-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210363 T 20011215

2001-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010702

1997-04-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970227

1996-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

1996-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 960618