Global Patent Index - EP 0750702 B1

EP 0750702 B1 2000-01-05 - DIGGER-LOADER

Title (en)

DIGGER-LOADER

Title (de)

BAGGERLADER

Title (fr)

TRACTOPELLE

Publication

EP 0750702 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95912312 A

Priority

  • FR 9500301 W
  • FR 9403307 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9525202A1] A digger-loader comprising a bucket (9) and a shovel (12) both mounted at the end of hinged arms (10, 13) and hydraulically powered. The bucket and the shovel are mounted on and hinged to the same end of the digger-loader.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02F 3/96

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02F 3/96 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02F 3/964 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9525202 A1 19950921; DE 69514339 D1 20000210; DE 69514339 T2 20000824; EP 0750702 A1 19970102; EP 0750702 B1 20000105; ES 2143618 T3 20000516; FR 2717515 A1 19950922; FR 2717515 B1 19960419

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050314

2003-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030203

2002-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020331

2002-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020331

2002-03-28 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: LE BREVET A ETE REACTIVE SELON LA DEMANDE DE POURSUITE DE LA PROCEDURE DU 28.12.2001

2002-03-06 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020306

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020101

2001-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-11-07 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010314

2001-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: BLONDIAUX CLAUDE

- Effective date: 20010331

2001-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010331

2001-03-15 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010315

2001-03-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010314

2000-12-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2143618 T3

2000-05-11 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20000511

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-04-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000405

2000-04-08 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20000408

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-03-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2000-03-22 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20000322

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-03-17 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20000317

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-02-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69514339 20000210

2000-01-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES GB IT LI

1997-02-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970113

1997-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960925

1997-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES GB IT LI