Global Patent Index - EP 0750860 B1

EP 0750860 B1 2000-02-09 - Shoe with an at least partially elastic lining

Title (en)

Shoe with an at least partially elastic lining

Title (de)

Schuh mit wenigstens teilweisem elastischem Futter

Title (fr)

Chaussure à doublure au moins partiellement élastique

Publication

EP 0750860 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96108304 A

Priority

FR 9508084 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0750860A1] The boot is constituted by an upper (2) with an external sole and a partially elastic lining (10). The lining defines a volume equal to the largest volume of foot which is to be fit in the boot. The lining volume is adjusted to adapt to the actual volume of foot in the boot by a double row of loops (16) with a lace passing through them. The lace has a pulling and locking tab (19) fixed to its upper loop and a self gripping fastener complementary to a similar fastener (7) on the boot tongue. The spacing of the double row of loops to define between the lining and the boot bottom, without lacing together the loops, a volume corresponding to the maximum foot volume to be introduced. When the loops are laced together the enclosed volume then corresponds to the minimum foot volume to be inserted.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 5/00; A43B 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/00 (2006.01); A43B 5/04 (2006.01); A43B 7/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 7/1495 (2013.01); A43B 5/00 (2013.01); A43B 5/002 (2013.01); A43B 5/0405 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0750860 A1 19970102; EP 0750860 B1 20000209; AT 189581 T 20000215; DE 69606588 D1 20000316; DE 69606588 T2 20000803; ES 2142516 T3 20000416; FR 2735954 A1 19970103; FR 2735954 B1 19970829; US 5940990 A 19990824; US 6367169 B1 20020409

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050524

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030611

2003-02-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-01-15 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020524

2003-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-12-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021203

2002-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020531

2002-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020531

2002-05-25 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020525

2002-05-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020524

2002-05-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020524

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010626

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-05-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20010529

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-05-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010523

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-05-08 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20010508

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-05-04 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010504

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-04-18 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20010418

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-01-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-11 [EN4] FR: NOTIFICATION OF NON FILING TRANSLATION IN AN EARLIER BOPI IS ERRONEOUS

2000-07-07 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-07-07 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000707

2000-04-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000323

2000-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2142516 T3

2000-04-06 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DOTT. GIOVANNI LECCE & C.

2000-03-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69606588 20000316

2000-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-02-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 189581 T 20000215

1998-12-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981109

1997-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961001

1997-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI