Global patent index - EP 0750968 B1

EP 0750968 B1 2000-02-16 - APPARATUS FOR CONDITIONING A POLISHING PAD

Title (en)

APPARATUS FOR CONDITIONING A POLISHING PAD

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM ABRICHTEN EINES POLIERKISSEN

Title (fr)

APPAREIL POUR DRESSER UN PATIN DE POLISSAGE

Publication

EP 0750968 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96304660 A

Priority

US 56495 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0750968A1] A conditioning end effector apparatus (10) for conditioning a CMP polish pad (40) includes an end effector (20) for contacting CMP polish pad (40). Holder mechanism (12) includes end effector recess (18) for receiving end effector (20) . Spacer mechanism (22 or 22') is also located at predetermined locations in end effector recess (18) to associate with end effector openings (26) in end effector (20) . End effector (20) firmly attaches through spacer mechanism (22 or 22') to holder mechanism (12) using a fastening device (24). Because of spacer mechanism (22 or 22'), end effector (20) is at distance from recess face (36) to permit slurry (38) that is deposited on CMP polish pad (40) to pass through end effector openings (26). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 37/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 53/007 (2006.01); B24B 53/017 (2012.01); H01L 21/304 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 53/017 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0750968 A1 19970102; EP 0750968 B1 20000216; DE 69606669 D1 20000323; DE 69606669 T2 20000817; JP H0911120 A 19970114

INPADOC legal status

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100625

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110101

2011-03-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-02-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100625

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090605

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090630

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090507

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080625

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090605

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070627

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-01-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-08-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2000-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-03-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69606669

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-23

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2000-02-16 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000216

2000-01-24 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

1997-12-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19971020

1997-08-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970626

1997-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL