Global patent index - EP 0751053 B1

EP 0751053 B1 2000-01-12 - Edge with surmounting aid for the load bearing platform of a road vehicle

Title (en)

Edge with surmounting aid for the load bearing platform of a road vehicle

Title (de)

Randleiste mit Ueberfahrhilfe für die Ladefläche eines Strassenfahrzeuges

Title (fr)

Bordure à structure d'aide au franchissement pour plateforme porteuse d'un véhicule routier

Publication

EP 0751053 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96440050 A

Priority

FR 9508018 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0751053A1] The railway wagon loading platform, onto which lorries are driven, has along its edges (1,2) several transverse structures (12). The road vehicle tyre can be supported on these to aid its clearance. The edging avoids the lateral overflowing of the road vehicle when moving onto the platform. Each platform edge is raised in the shape of an arch forming an upper rounded edge (8). On the arch internal side is a lower lateral edge (9) which is shaped along a cut section (10) to form a continuously sloping sliding ramp (11). This section is used as a guide surface and, in extreme cases, constitutes a sliding plane which prevents all oblique crossing by the wheel.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61D 3/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61D 3/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61D 3/188 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0751053 A1 19970102; EP 0751053 B1 20000112; AT 188657 T 20000115; DE 69606101 D1 20000217; DE 69606101 T2 20000824; ES 2142036 T3 20000401; FR 2736028 A1 19970103; FR 2736028 B1 19970808

INPADOC legal status

2016-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2015-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150623

- Year of fee payment: 20

2005-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20040622

2005-06-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050621

2005-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050101

2004-06-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040622

2004-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20040101

2004-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040101

2003-06-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030625

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-06-21 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030621

2003-06-16 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030616

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-06-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020628

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-06-25 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020625

- Year of fee payment: 7

2000-12-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-04-07 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MARIETTI E GISLON S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2142036

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69606101

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-02-17

2000-01-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES IT LI NL

2000-01-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 188657

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-01-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1998-12-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981111

1997-08-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970620

1997-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES IT LI NL