Global Patent Index - EP 0751083 B1

EP 0751083 B1 2000-02-09 - Aerosol spray valve and aerosol container provided with such a valve

Title (en)

Aerosol spray valve and aerosol container provided with such a valve

Title (de)

Druckbehälterventil sowie mit einem solchen Ventil versehener Druckbehälter

Title (fr)

Valve pour pulvérisateur et pulvérisateur ainsi équipe

Publication

EP 0751083 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96401438 A

Priority

FR 9507925 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0751083A1] The valve (1) for a sprayer comprises a product container , a distributor and a gas propellant. The valve has a control rod (3) which moves axially in its body (2) between open and closed positions. A spring (4) housed in the valve body returns the rod to the top closed position of the valve. The control rod is covered with a push button (5) having a spray nozzle (6). The rod has channels (22,28) for leading the product and propellant gas to the spray nozzle. These channels discharge at one external end of the rod through axially orientated orifices. The orifices are bordered by rings (16,21) which are applied against the front faces of the sealing joints (18,11) through which the rod slides. The rings are shaped to be pushed in at different depths into the joints to sequentially isolate the orifices.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 83/34; B65D 83/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/34 (2013.01); B65D 83/66 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0751083 A1 19970102; EP 0751083 B1 20000209; DE 69606589 D1 20000316; DE 69606589 T2 20000914; ES 2143155 T3 20000501; FR 2736039 A1 19970103; FR 2736039 B1 19970801

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050628

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030711

2004-04-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-02-19 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020628

2003-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030101

2002-06-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020629

2002-06-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020628

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20010629

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-06-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010627

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-06-18 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010618

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-06-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010611

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-01-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-11 [EN4] FR: NOTIFICATION OF NON FILING TRANSLATION IN AN EARLIER BOPI IS ERRONEOUS

2000-07-07 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-07-07 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000707

2000-05-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000425

2000-05-02 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2000-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2143155 T3

2000-03-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69606589 20000316

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1998-11-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980923

1997-03-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970120

1997-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT