Global Patent Index - EP 0751245 B1

EP 0751245 B1 2002-11-27 - Heating apparatus for heating a moving yarn

Title (en)

Heating apparatus for heating a moving yarn

Title (de)

Heizeinrichtung zum Erwärmen eines laufenden Fadens

Title (fr)

Dispositif de chauffage pour chauffer un fil en mouvement

Publication

EP 0751245 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96109591 A

Priority

DE 19523356 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0751245A2] A heater for a running yarn (7) has heating surfaces in the form of a groove with several yarn guides (2) to give zig- zag changes of direction to the yarn and space it from the heating surface along the entire length of the heater. The number of changes of direction is smaller than the number of yarn guides. Pref. the yarn direction only changes between pairs of successive yarn guides, i.e. sections of threadline parallel to the heater alternate with inclined sections. The yarn guides can be formed by slots, by circular rods or by half-round swaged beads. The distance between pairs of guides for a parallel section is pref. less than half the width of the heater groove. The threadline can be in the approximate shape of a sine curve with the slope changing sign after a constant number of yarn guides. The yarn guides can be spaced equidistantly.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D02J 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D02J 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D02J 13/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0751245 A2 19970102; EP 0751245 A3 19990721; EP 0751245 B1 20021127; CN 1066219 C 20010523; CN 1144854 A 19970312; KR 100396157 B1 20031128; TW 381129 B 20000201; US 5797256 A 19980825

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080614

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090101

2009-04-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090228

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070614

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070625

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-02-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070614

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070628

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-08-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070820

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-07-06 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060706

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-07-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030326

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59609899 20030109

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010521

1999-11-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990906

1999-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1997-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT