Global Patent Index - EP 0751249 A3

EP 0751249 A3 2000-06-07 - Method and apparatus for consolidating a fibrous fleece

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for consolidating a fibrous fleece

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Verfestigung eines Faservlieses

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de consolidation d'un non-tissé fibreux

Publication

EP 0751249 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 96110029 A

Priority

DE 19522763 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0751249A2] A process is for consolidating a nonwoven consisting of synthetic staple fibres (e.g. polyester, polyethylene or polypropylene fibres) and/or of natural fibres. The nonwoven is up to 10 mm thick and the process involves laying the nonwoven, which is produced on a card or aerodynamically, on a previously consolidated web. The nonwoven is then joined with the support web in a continuous treatment process by means of water needling with a water pressure of at least 100 (pref. 180) bar.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04H 1/46; D04H 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04H 18/04 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04H 18/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0751249 A2 19970102; EP 0751249 A3 20000607; EP 0751249 B1 20031022; DE 19522763 A1 19970102; US 5701643 A 19971230

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-20 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20041128

2004-09-08 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: RIETER PERFOJET

- Effective date: 20040717

2004-07-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-06-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040618

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-04-21 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20031022

2004-04-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040420

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-11-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59610781 P 20031127

2003-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-10-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-10-22 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031022

2002-07-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020618

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000529

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-06-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7D 04H 1/46 A, 7D 04H 13/00 B

1997-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT