Global Patent Index - EP 0751265 B1

EP 0751265 B1 2000-06-28 - Clean room ceiling structure

Title (en)

Clean room ceiling structure

Title (de)

Hängedeckenbauweise für einen Reinraum

Title (fr)

Structure de faux plafond pour salle blanche

Publication

EP 0751265 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96115244 A

Priority

  • EP 92307081 A
  • US 73969391 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0530976A1] A ceiling structure for retaining air filter panels (12) having a grid of interconnected rails (16c). Each rail (16c) has a recessed channel (124) for containing a light fixture (220) so that the light fixture (220) does not hang below the ceiling surface. The structure may also include hanger hooks attachable to the rails for suspending fixtures, wall panels, and pivoting wall headers to permit angled arrangements of wall panels. The light fixture (220) attached within the channel (124) is an extruded panel (230) that snaps into the channel (124) and which includes standard light tube connectors (232). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 9/02; E04B 9/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 9/00 (2006.01); E04B 9/02 (2006.01); E04B 9/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 9/064 (2013.01); E04B 9/006 (2013.01); E04B 9/008 (2013.01); E04B 9/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0530976 A1 19930310; EP 0530976 B1 19970409; DE 69218860 D1 19970515; DE 69231211 D1 20000803; DE 69231211 T2 20010315; DK 0751265 T3 20000828; EP 0751265 A2 19970102; EP 0751265 A3 19970122; EP 0751265 B1 20000628; JP H05195595 A 19930803

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100803

2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-07-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100803

2011-06-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69231211

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-05-25 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2011-05-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100803

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090827

- Year of fee payment: 18

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090825

- Year of fee payment: 18

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090817

- Year of fee payment: 18

2009-10-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20090825

- Year of fee payment: 18

2006-07-07 [REG FR D3] DECISION TO REVOKE THE DECISION OF LAPSE

2006-05-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060428

2006-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060428

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-04-30 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2000-12-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2000-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000928

2000-09-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-28 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-08-03 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000803

2000-08-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69231211 20000803

2000-07-26 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2000-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-06-28 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 530976

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

2000-06-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000628

2000-06-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000628

2000-06-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000628

2000-06-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000628

2000-06-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000628

1998-12-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981103

1997-09-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LUDWIG, CRAIG S.

1997-09-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SPRADLING, RICHARD E.

1997-01-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

1997-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960923

1997-01-02 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 530976

1997-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE