Global patent index - EP 0751271 B1

EP 0751271 B1 2000-08-30 - Tubular mast door

Title (en)

Tubular mast door

Title (de)

Rohrmast-Tür

Title (fr)

Porte pour mât tubulaire

Publication

EP 0751271 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96304683 A

Priority

  • EP 96304683 A
  • EP 95304482 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0751271A1] A door (28) for covering an inspecting opening in a tubular mast (26), such as a lamp post, the door (28) being hingedly connected to the mast (26) by hinge means (12, 14, 16). The hinge means (12, 14, 16) comprises a hinge pin (16) slidable transversely with respect to its length in a retaining means (14) and the hinge pin (16) being slidable out of retention by the retaining means (14) to disconnect the hinge means (12, 14, 16) and permit removal of the door (28) from the mast (26). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 12/08; E05D 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04H 12/00 (2006.01); E05D 3/06 (2006.01); E05D 7/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 3/12 (2013.01); E04H 12/003 (2013.01); E05D 7/12 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/132 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0751271 A1 19970102; EP 0751271 B1 20000830

INPADOC legal status

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HUNTER DOUGLAS INDUSTRIES B.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20050630

2006-03-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-03-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20050625

2006-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20060101

2006-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2006-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060103

2006-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060101

2005-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050625

2004-08-13 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040813

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-07-08 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040708

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-06-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040629

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-06-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040623

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-06-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040608

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-06-03 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040603

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-10-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-10-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69610042

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-10-05

2000-09-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ROTTMANN, ZIMMERMANN + PARTNER AG

2000-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB LI NL

1998-12-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981020

1997-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970410

1997-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB LI NL