Global Patent Index - EP 0751275 B1

EP 0751275 B1 2002-09-25 - Easily transported and assembled wall structure with sliding door

Title (en)

Easily transported and assembled wall structure with sliding door

Title (de)

Leicht transportierbare und zusammensetzbare Wandstruktur mit Schiebetür

Title (fr)

Structure de cloison avec porte coulissante facile à transporter et à assembler

Publication

EP 0751275 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96100526 A

Priority

IT MI951385 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0751275A2] A wall structure with a sliding door (16) comprises a perimetral frame (1) consisting of a plurality of perimetral elements (2, 3, 4, 5) joined together, to the opposing faces (7, 8) of which there being fixed the wall panels (14, 15) of said structure, between said wall panels (14, 15) there being defined a compartment (41) into which said door (16) can slide to be totally contained therein. The structure comprises elongate modular elements (21, 22, 10, 10A, 11, 11A) to be associated with said perimetral elements (2, 3, 4, 5), said modular elements (21, 22, 10, 10A, 11, 11A) defining guide means (12) for the door (16) during its movement and support means (10, 10A, 11, 11A) for the wall panels (14, 15), which are slidingly engaged with the perimetral elements before being finally fixed to them, said support means comprising adhesive means (60) arranged to cooperate with said wall panels (14, 15) to retain them at least prior to their fixing to the perimetral elements (2, 3, 4, 5). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/4654 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

DE 2633447 A1 19780126 - SPIEGELUNION FLABEG GMBH

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB GR IE IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0751275 A2 19970102; EP 0751275 A3 19971119; EP 0751275 B1 20020925; DE 69623870 D1 20021031; DE 69623870 T2 20030508; ES 2182922 T3 20030316; IT 1277197 B1 19971105; IT MI951385 A1 19961230; IT MI951385 D0 19950628

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150117

2016-02-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160226

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150116

2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150202

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150801

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150116

2015-10-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150930

2015-09-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150116

2015-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69623870

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140128

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20131223

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140108

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131120

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20131122

- Year of fee payment: 19

2010-05-18 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

2010-05-14 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2010-04-30 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20091201

2005-01-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050116

2003-11-12 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-03-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2182922 T3

2003-03-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-01-16 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030116

2002-12-25 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021225

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69623870 20021031

2002-10-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB GR IE IT NL SE

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-09-25 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-09-25 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-09-25 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020925

1999-11-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991011

1998-04-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980216

1997-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB GR IE IT NL SE

1997-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB GR IE IT NL SE