Global patent index - EP 0751278 B1

EP 0751278 B1 2000-01-05 - Motorized roller shutter

Title (en)

Motorized roller shutter

Title (de)

Motorisierter Rolladen

Title (fr)

Volet roulant motorisé

Publication

EP 0751278 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96440048 A

Priority

  • FR 9507967 A
  • FR 9600639 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0751278A1] The motorised roller shutter comprises a braked motor reducer (5) rotating a shutter winding tube (2) held at its ends (6,8) by support webs (3,4). A declutching coupling (11) is interposed between the motor reducer output shaft (10) and the winding tube. This enables, in the de-clutched position, the free rotation of the tube relative to the reducer under the influence of a force exerted directly on the shutter. A return spring (12), constrained during unwinding of the shutter, exerts a return couple on the winding tube. This causes tube rotation in the direction of shutter winding when a push is exerted on the shutter to open it. The winding tube is rotated by the reducer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/74

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/62 (2006.01); E06B 9/72 (2006.01); E06B 9/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/62 (2013.01); E06B 9/72 (2013.01); E06B 9/74 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0751278 A1 19970102; EP 0751278 B1 20000105; AT 188533 T 20000115; DE 69605983 D1 20000210; DE 69605983 T2 20000817; ES 2142563 T3 20000416; FR 2736087 A1 19970103; FR 2736087 B1 19980109

INPADOC legal status

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070613

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090101

2007-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20060614

2007-06-07 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070607

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-06-14 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060614

2005-07-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050728

- Year of fee payment: 10

2001-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2000-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. BUBENDORFF

- Effective date: 20000630

2000-12-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000630

2000-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000630

2000-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000630

2000-06-05 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT; NO LEGAL EFFECT FROM

2000-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2142563

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-04-12 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLICATION

- Owner name: BUBENDORFF VOLET ROULANT

2000-03-14 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUGNION S.P.A.

2000-02-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69605983

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000210

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-01-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES IT LI NL

2000-01-05 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000105

2000-01-05 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000105

2000-01-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 188533

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 20000115

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

1998-11-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981002

1997-04-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970222

1997-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES IT LI NL