Global Patent Index - EP 0751290 B1

EP 0751290 B1 2000-03-22 - Fuel injection nozzle clamping structure

Title (en)

Fuel injection nozzle clamping structure

Title (de)

Anordnung zum Festklemmen einer Kraftstoffeinspritzdüse

Title (fr)

Structure de fixation d'une tuyère d'injection de combustible

Publication

EP 0751290 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96109928 A

Priority

JP 15957195 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0751290A1] A fuel injection nozzle clamping structure adapted to fix three series-arranged fuel injection nozzles 1 for an engine by a uniform level of force by one nozzle clamp 19 having both-end nozzle contacting portions 9 and intermediate nozzle contacting portions 20, and insert holes 8 for stud bolts 7 in the parts of the nozzle clamp 19 which are halfway between adjacent nozzle contacting portions 9, 20. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 61/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02F 1/24 (2006.01); F02M 61/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/14 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

EP 0491582 A1 19920624 - PEUGEOT [FR], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0751290 A1 19970102; EP 0751290 B1 20000322; DE 69607248 D1 20000427; DE 69607248 T2 20000928; JP 2937081 B2 19990823; JP H0914084 A 19970114

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040227

2004-02-11 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030620

2004-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040101

2003-06-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030620

2002-05-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020523

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-05-20 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020520

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-05-13 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020513

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69607248 20000427

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-08-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980709

1997-05-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970320

1997-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB