Global Patent Index - EP 0751292 B1

EP 0751292 B1 2001-04-18 - Starter of motor vehicle and contactor for such a starter with a control auxiliary relay integrated in the contactor

Title (en)

Starter of motor vehicle and contactor for such a starter with a control auxiliary relay integrated in the contactor

Title (de)

Anlasser für Motorfahrzeug und Anlassschütz mit einem in Anlassschütz integriertem Steuerhilfsrelais

Title (fr)

Démarreur de véhicule automobile et contacteur pour un tel démarreur comportant un relais auxiliaire de commande intégré au contacteur

Publication

EP 0751292 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96401393 A

Priority

FR 9507807 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0751292A1] The starter (10) includes the electromagnetic contactor (14) held in an upper casing, with the auxiliary command relay held in an extension to the electromagnetic contactor casing. A main coil is connected to the battery by the auxiliary command relay (32) which has a moving coil (40) which connects up to connector pads to connect the main coil and the wire to the battery. The main coil has an isolating cap (50) with an extension piece (62) covering the relay.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02N 11/00; H01H 51/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02N 11/00 (2006.01); F02N 11/08 (2006.01); H01H 50/14 (2006.01); H01H 51/06 (2006.01); H01H 50/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 51/065 (2013.01); F02N 11/00 (2013.01); H01H 50/021 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0751292 A1 19970102; EP 0751292 B1 20010418; CN 1077226 C 20020102; CN 1139180 A 19970101; DE 69612528 D1 20010523; DE 69612528 T2 20010906; FR 2736099 A1 19970103; FR 2736099 B1 19970801; US 5694100 A 19971202

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-25 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69612528

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150612

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080625

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080625

2009-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080625

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070616

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070612

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-04-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-24 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2001-05-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69612528 20010523

2001-05-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010418

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

1999-10-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990906

1997-09-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970702

1997-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT