Global Patent Index - EP 0751297 B1

EP 0751297 B1 2002-09-18 - Turbo molecular pump

Title (en)

Turbo molecular pump

Title (de)

Turbomolekularpumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe turbomoléculaire

Publication

EP 0751297 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96401388 A

Priority

FR 9507922 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0751297A1] The turbomolecular pump comprises a rotor (1) and a stator (2) with rotor stage fins (1A - 1G) alternated with stator fins (2A- 2F). The rotor is in the shape of a bell and the stator has an external part (2') which carries its fins and an internal part (2") penetrating into the rotor. The internal part encloses the pump delivery and comprises an external peripheral rim forming a flange (4). The stator external part carrying the stator fins is formed from two half stators (2'A,2'B) joined in a diametral plane. Each half stator is a monobloc and is positioned axially and hooked onto a span (12), located at the end opposite suction, in a circular groove (11) complementary to the stator internal part. The external diameter of the rotor first fin stage (1A), on the suction side, corresponds, with a small operating play, to the external diameter of the stator external part.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 19/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 19/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 19/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0751297 A1 19970102; EP 0751297 B1 20020918; DE 69623700 D1 20021024; DE 69623700 T2 20030731; FR 2736103 A1 19970103; FR 2736103 B1 19970808; JP 3766138 B2 20060412; JP H0914185 A 19970114; US 5722819 A 19980303

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130624

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130624

2014-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130630

2014-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130630

2014-03-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69623700

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-02-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130624

2014-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120711

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120620

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120626

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20120626

- Year of fee payment: 17

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69623700 20021024

2002-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: CABINET ROLAND NITHARDT CONSEILS EN PROPRIETE INDU

2002-10-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALCATEL

2002-02-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011227

1997-08-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970606

1997-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI