Global Patent Index - EP 0751540 B1

EP 0751540 B1 2000-04-12 - Bobbin for transformer and transformer having such a bobbin

Title (en)

Bobbin for transformer and transformer having such a bobbin

Title (de)

Spulenkörper für Transformator und Transformator mit einem solchen Spulenkörper

Title (fr)

Carcasse pour transformateur, et transformateur comportant une telle carcasse

Publication

EP 0751540 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96401415 A

Priority

FR 9507898 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0751540A1] The frame includes the terminal (24A,24B) which is in the form of an inverted 'U'. The first arm of the 'U' is forcibly fitted into a slotted housing within the connector (16A,16B), and to the rear, it has a middle part extending to the terminal point. The second arm of the 'U' is backed onto the connector and includes the internal connection (25A,25B). The internal connection belonging to each electrical winding lies at the end of a bend directed wholly towards the exterior and comprises a simple point parallel to the U-arm or a hook to clamp down on the wire. The external winding is connected by a threaded hole (36) to receive a screw (38) which clamps the wire under a plate (39).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 5/04; H01R 4/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 5/04 (2006.01); H01R 4/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/34 (2013.01); H01F 5/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0751540 A1 19970102; EP 0751540 B1 20000412; DE 69607682 D1 20000518; DE 69607682 T2 20000810; FR 2736199 A1 19970103; FR 2736199 B1 19970905

INPADOC legal status


2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100626

2011-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110101

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110101

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100626

2011-02-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100626

2011-01-12 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110101

2010-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LEGRAND FRANCE

- Effective date: 20100630

2010-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LEGRAND SNC

- Effective date: 20100630

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090627

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-02-26 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090701

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090611

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090604

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090527

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-05-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: LEGRAND FRANCE

2008-05-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: LEGRAND SNC

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000519

2000-06-08 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: FUMERO BREVETTI S.N.C.

2000-05-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69607682 20000518

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB IT NL

1999-06-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990420

1997-03-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970107

1997-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB IT NL