Global Patent Index - EP 0751545 B1

EP 0751545 B1 2001-12-19 - Starter contactor having an electronic circuit integrated to the contactor, and vehicle starter having such a contactor

Title (en)

Starter contactor having an electronic circuit integrated to the contactor, and vehicle starter having such a contactor

Title (de)

Anlasser-Schütz mit eingebauter elektronische Schaltung, und Kraftfahrzeuganlasser mit solchem Schütz versehen

Title (fr)

Contacteur de démarreur comportant un circuit électronique de commande intégré au contacteur, et démarreur de véhicule comportant un tel contacteur

Publication

EP 0751545 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96401392 A

Priority

FR 9507808 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0751545A1] The starter switch has an annular cylindrical armature (14) forming the casing for a coil (14) which operates a moving core (12) that acts on a control rod (31). The rod crosses a fixed disc-shaped core (22) and operates moving contacts (54) which join with fixed contacts (50,52) belonging to the starter motor supply circuit. The moving contact moves in a housing (38) in the cover (32) between the base (34) of the cover and a transverse, axially symmetric, disc-shaped cap (68) in the skirt (36) of the cover. The skirt extends beyond the cap to make a cavity (42) for the PCB disc (78). The moving contact rests against part (64) of the cap which has a central sleeve (72) and hole for the control rod.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 51/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02N 11/00 (2006.01); F02N 11/08 (2006.01); H01H 50/14 (2006.01); H01H 51/06 (2006.01); H01H 50/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 51/065 (2013.01); F02N 11/00 (2013.01); H01H 50/021 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0751545 A1 19970102; EP 0751545 B1 20011219; CN 1076440 C 20011219; CN 1143159 A 19970219; DE 69618090 D1 20020131; DE 69618090 T2 20020711; FR 2736100 A1 19970103; FR 2736100 B1 19970801; JP 4598202 B2 20101215; JP H09105372 A 19970422; US 5703551 A 19971230

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-25 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69618090

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150612

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080625

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080625

2009-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080625

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070616

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070612

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-03-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020301

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69618090 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2001-03-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010208

1997-09-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970702

1997-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT