Global Patent Index - EP 0751585 B1

EP 0751585 B1 2000-01-19 - Shift-preventing end position clamping member for side-by-side terminal blocks

Title (en)

Shift-preventing end position clamping member for side-by-side terminal blocks

Title (de)

Endwinkel zur Lagesicherung von Reihenklemmen

Title (fr)

Butée d'arrêt pour barrettes de raccordement

Publication

EP 0751585 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95110102 A

Priority

EP 95110102 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0751585A1] The end angle has retaining arms (1,2) for engaging behind the carrier rail side edges, at least one of the retaining arms being sprung in the sidewards direction and both retaining arms providing a tension strap for the carrier rail position. A pivoted spring compression strap (4) acts on the tension strap and cooperates with the carrier rail edges at its ends (5,6), which are shaped and/or formed of a selected material, to prevent displacement transverse to the end angle. The compression strap allows positioning of the carrier rail edges, via a spring effect.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 9/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 9/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 9/2616 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0751585 A1 19970102; EP 0751585 B1 20000119; DE 59507650 D1 20000224

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090101

2007-08-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070822

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-06-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050628

2004-04-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040227

2002-06-25 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020625

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-01-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-04-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-03-30 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59507650 20000224

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

1998-10-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980909

1997-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960404

1997-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT