Global Patent Index - EP 0751793 B1

EP 0751793 B1 2002-09-11 - GASTROSTOMY FEEDING PORT WITH ONE-WAY VALVE

Title (en)

GASTROSTOMY FEEDING PORT WITH ONE-WAY VALVE

Title (de)

GASTROSTOMIEERNÄHRUNGSPORT MIT EINEM EINWEGVENTIL

Title (fr)

EMBOUCHURE D'ALIMENTATION GASTROSTOMIQUE A VANNE UNIDIRECTIONNELLE

Publication

EP 0751793 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95911987 A

Priority

  • US 9502474 W
  • US 20244394 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9523001A1] A gastrostomy feeding port (100) is disclosed which includes a housing (20) and a resilient valve member (10). Housing (20) defines an inner passageway (29) which provides fluid communication into a long term indwelling catheter and includes a rigid compression collar portion (21) which defines a valve member receiving cavity (22) within the inner passageway. Valve member (10) has a diaphragm portion (11) which has an "S" shaped slit (16) therethrough, and an outer peripheral edge which generally conforms in shape to the valve member receiving cavity but is larger than the cavity when uncompressed, and an outer wall portion (12) which extends away from the outer peripheral edge of diaphragm portion (11). Valve member (10) compressively fits within receiving cavity (22) by advancing outer wall portion (12) into cavity (22) to thereby cause the outer peripheral edge to be compressed to fit within cavity (22), with compression collar (21) pressing inwardly against the peripheral edge of diagphragm portion (11) to bias slit (16) toward a normally closed position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61M 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61M 37/00 (2006.01); A61J 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61J 15/0015 (2013.01); A61J 15/0092 (2013.01); A61M 39/0247 (2013.01); A61M 2210/1053 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9523001 A1 19950831; AT 223742 T 20020915; AT 295713 T 20050615; AU 1935295 A 19950911; AU 688875 B2 19980319; CA 2184275 A1 19950831; CA 2184275 C 20060606; DE 69528162 D1 20021017; DE 69528162 T2 20030528; DE 69534219 D1 20050623; DK 0751793 T3 20030113; EP 0751793 A1 19970108; EP 0751793 A4 19971119; EP 0751793 B1 20020911; EP 1249220 A2 20021016; EP 1249220 A3 20021030; EP 1249220 B1 20050518; ES 2182893 T3 20030316; JP H09509596 A 19970930; US 5718691 A 19980217

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150227

2015-04-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150228

2015-03-25 [REG IE MK9A] PATENT EXPIRED

2015-03-25 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20150227

2015-03-01 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69528162

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140417

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140226

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-04-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20140311

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110301

2012-04-11 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120411

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2012-01-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69528162

- Representative's name: MEHLER ACHLER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-11-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111102

2011-10-03 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100223

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100215

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20100211

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100312

- Year of fee payment: 16

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-04-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-27 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2182893 T3

2003-03-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-02-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-28 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-01-13 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-12-17 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021217

2002-12-11 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021211

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69528162 20021017

2002-10-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-09-11 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-09-11 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-09-11 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-09-11 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-09-11 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-09-11 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-09-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 223742 T 20020915

2000-08-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000717

1997-12-03 [RA4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19971008

1997-11-19 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19971008

1997-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1997-01-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960923

1997-01-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE